EP1144966 - HEAT DETECTOR WITH A LIMITED ANGLE OF VIEW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/42] | HEAT DETECTOR WITH A LIMITED ANGLE OF VISION | ||
[2002/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales 173, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHERON, François, Thomson-CSF Propriété Intell. Dépt. Brevets, 13, ave. du Prés. Salvador Allende F-94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 02 /
JOLLIOT, Marie-Benoite, E., Thomson-CSF P. I. Dépt. Brev., 13, av. du Président Salvador Allende F-94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 03 /
BERGINC, Gérard, Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellect. Dépt. Brev., 13, av. du Président Salvador Allende F-94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Régis Louis Michel, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Vigand, Régis Louis Michel, et al THALES Intellectual Property, 13, avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/42] | Vigand, Régis Louis Michel Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle 13, avenue du Président S. Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00929645.0 | 19.05.2000 | [2001/42] | WO2000FR01377 | Priority number, date | FR19990007105 | 04.06.1999 Original published format: FR 9907105 | [2001/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0075615 | Date: | 14.12.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1144966 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1144966 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/06, G01J1/06 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
G01J5/06 (EP,US);
G01J1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/29] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMISCHER DETEKTOR MIT BEGRENZTEM SICHTWINKEL | [2001/42] | English: | HEAT DETECTOR WITH A LIMITED ANGLE OF VIEW | [2002/51] | French: | DETECTEUR THERMIQUE A ANGLE DE VUE LIMITE | [2001/42] |
Former [2001/42] | HEAT DETECTOR WITH A LIMITED ANGLE OF VISION | Miscellaneous | EPB 2001/42: Derzeit sind die WIPO-Publikationsdaten A3 nicht verfügbar. | EPB 2001/42: WIPO A3 publication data is not currently available. | EPB 2001/42: L'OMPI données de publication A3 ne sont pas actuellement disponibles. | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 28.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4431918 (WHITE WILLIAM J [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 15 - line 32 * * column 3, line 45 - line 68 * * figure 7 *; | [A]JPS61205827 ; | [A]JPS58167928 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870203), vol. 011, no. 035, Database accession no. (P - 542), & JP61205827 A 19860912 (NEC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840106), vol. 008, no. 001, Database accession no. (P - 246), & JP58167928 A 19831004 (MITSUBISHI DENKI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |