EP1209752 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARUGUCHI, Hideki c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Z-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
TOMOMATSU, Yoshihumi Fukuryo Semi-Con Eng. Corp. 1-1, Imajuku-higashi 1-chome Nishi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 819-0161 / JP | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
HARUGUCHI, Hideki Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Z-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
TOMOMATSU, Yoshihumi Fukuryo Semi-Con Eng. Corp. 1-1, Imajuku-higashi 1-chome Nishi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 819-0161 / JP | |||
Former [2002/22] | 01 /
HARUGUCHI, Hideki Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
TOMOMATSU, Yoshihumi Fukuryo Semi-Con Eng. Corp. 1-1, Imajuku-higashi 1-chome Nishi-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 819-0161 / JP | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00929818.3 | 22.05.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000JP03238 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0191191 | Date: | 29.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1209752 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1209752 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/78 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
H01L29/7395 (EP,US);
H01L29/78 (KR);
H01L29/0696 (EP,US);
H01L29/42368 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2004/20] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2002/22] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2002/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2002 | Translation filed | 21.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 22.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | FR | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | [2013/23] |
Former [2013/21] | GB | 22.05.2012 | |
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CH | 31.05.2012 | |
LI | 31.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0615293 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10* page 10, line 29 - page 11, line 54; figure 4 *; | [XY]EP0801425 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4 * column 10, line 50 - column 16, line 34; figures 1-4 * [Y] 5-8; | [A]US5703383 (NAKAYAMA KAZUYA [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19750413 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [Y] 7,8 * column 4, line 49 - column 6, line 21 *; | [Y]WO9938214 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 5-8 * page 4 - page 6; figures 1,4,17 *; | [E]EP1050908 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [E] 5-8; | [A] - MAJUMDAR G ET AL, "ACTIVE SURGE VOLTAGE CLAMPED 600A IPM FOR HIGH POWER APPLICATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 7TH. INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON POWER SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES AND IC'S. (ISPSD). YOKOHAMA, MAY 23 - 25, 1995, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON POWER SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES AND IC'S. (ISPSD), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19950523), vol. SYMP. 7, ISBN 0-7803-2619-9, pages 75 - 79, XP000594243 [A] 1-10 * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISPSD.1995.515012 | International search | [A]US4532534 (FORD RAYMOND T [US], et al); | [A]JPH01207977 (NEC CORP); | [A]US5169793 (OKABE NAOTO [JP], et al); | [A]US5208471 (MORI MUTSUHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]JPH1187702 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |