EP1097250 - METHOD OF MAKING A PVD AL2O3 COATED CUTTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/19] | METHOD OF MAKING A PVD AL 2?O 3? COATED CUTTING TOOL | ||
[2005/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | ||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property HB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | ||
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states Sandvik AB (publ) 81181 Sandviken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHILLER, Siegfried Plattleite 17 D-01129 Dresden / DE | 02 /
GOEDICKE, Klaus Pfeifferhannsstrasse 78 D-01307 Dresden / DE | 03 /
FIETZKE, Fred Leisniger Strasse 63 D-01127 Dresden / DE | 04 /
ZYWITZKI, Olaf Kyffhäuserstrasse 19 D-01309 Dresden / DE | 05 /
SJÖSTRAND, Mats Köpenhamnsgatan 26 S-164 42 Kista / SE | 06 /
LJUNGBERG, Björn Kulstötarvägen 96 S-122 44 Enskede / SE | [2005/40] |
Former [2001/21] | 01 /
SCHILLER, Siegfried Plattleite 17 D-01129 Dresden / DE | ||
02 /
GOEDICKE, Klaus Pfeifferhannsstrasse 78 D-01307 Dresden / DE | |||
03 /
FIETZKE, Fred Leisniger Strasse 63 D-01127 Dresden / DE | |||
04 /
ZYWITZKI, Olaf J.-S.-Bach-Strasse 6 D-09599 Freiberg / DE | |||
05 /
SJÖSTRAND, Mats Köpenhamnsgatan 26 S-164 42 Kista / SE | |||
06 /
LJUNGBERG, Björn Kulstötarvägen 96 S-122 44 Enskede / SE | |||
Former [2001/19] | 01 /
SCHILLER, Siegfried Plattleite 17 D-01129 Dresden / DE | ||
02 /
GOEDICKE, Klaus Pfeifferhannsstrasse 78 D-01307 Dresden / DE | |||
03 /
FIETZKE, Fred Leisniger Strasse 63 D-01127 Dresden / DE | |||
04 /
ZYWITZKI, Olaf J.-S.-Bach-Strasse 6 D-09599 Freiberg / DE | |||
05 /
SJÖSTRAND, Mats Imatragatan 328 S-164 78 Kista / SE | |||
06 /
LJUNGBERG, Björn Kulstötarvägen 96 S-122 44 Enskede / SE | Representative(s) | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel Sandvik AB Patents & Licences Fack 811 81 Sandviken 1 / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Taquist, Lennart Sandvik AB Patents & Licences Fack 811 81 Sandviken 1 / SE | Application number, filing date | 00930015.3 | 03.05.2000 | [2001/19] | WO2000SE00857 | Priority number, date | SE19990001650 | 06.05.1999 Original published format: SE 9901650 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0068452 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097250 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1097250 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/08, C23C14/35, C23C28/04, // B23B27:14 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
C23C14/345 (EP,US);
C23C14/354 (KR);
C23C14/0036 (KR);
C23C14/0042 (EP,US);
C23C14/081 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/35 (EP,US);
C23C14/541 (KR);
C23C28/044 (EP,US);
C23C30/005 (EP,US);
B23B2228/10 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2004/20] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PVD AL2O3 BESCHICHTETEN SCHNEIDWERKZEUGS | [2005/17] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING A PVD AL2O3 COATED CUTTING TOOL | [2005/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN OUTIL DE COUPE A REVETEMENT PAR DEPOT CHIMIQUE DE AL2O3 EN PHASE VAPEUR | [2005/17] |
Former [2001/19] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PVD AL 2?O 3? BESCHICHTETEN SCHNEIDWERKZEUGS | ||
Former [2001/19] | METHOD OF MAKING A PVD AL 2?O 3? COATED CUTTING TOOL | ||
Former [2001/19] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN OUTIL DE COUPE A REVETEMENT PAR DEPOT CHIMIQUE DE AL 2?O 3? EN PHASE VAPEUR | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 20.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 02.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5516588 (VAN DEN BERG HENDRIKUS [NL], et al); | [X] - F. FIETZKE ET AL., "The deposition of hard crystalline A1203 layers by means of bipolar pulsed magnetron sputtering", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 86-87, pages 657 - 663, XP000999905 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0257-8972(96)03075-7 | [A] - O. ZYWITZKI ET AL., "Effect of the substrate temperature on the structure and properties of A1203 layers reactively deposited by pulsed magnetron sputtering", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 82, pages 169 - 175, XP000930032 |