EP1176868 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTIVELY CLASSIFYING POULTRY EGGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMBREX INC. P.O. Box 13989 Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709-3989 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states EMBREX INC. P.O. Box 13989 Research Triangle Park North Carolina 27709-3989 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEBRANK, John, H. 216 Jefferson Drive Durham, NC 27712 / US | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00930545.9 | 10.05.2000 | [2002/06] | WO2000US12756 | Priority number, date | US19990309794 | 11.05.1999 Original published format: US 309794 | US20000563218 | 02.05.2000 Original published format: US 563218 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0067566 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1176868 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1176868 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A01K43/00, A01K45/00, G01N33/08 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
A01K43/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/08 (EP,KR,US);
A01K45/007 (EP,US);
G01N33/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/29] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SELEKTIVEN KLASSIFIZIERUNG VON HÜHNEREIERN | [2002/06] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTIVELY CLASSIFYING POULTRY EGGS | [2002/06] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CLASSIFICATION SELECTIVE D'OEUFS DE VOLAILLE | [2002/06] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 13.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03000850.2 / EP1302102 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.07.2003 | BE | 16.07.2003 | CH | 16.07.2003 | CY | 16.07.2003 | FI | 16.07.2003 | LI | 16.07.2003 | DK | 16.10.2003 | GR | 16.10.2003 | SE | 16.10.2003 | PT | 16.12.2003 | [2007/08] |
Former [2004/31] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
PT | 16.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
DK | 16.10.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
BE | 16.07.2003 | ||
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
CH | 16.07.2003 | ||
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
LI | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
SE | 16.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 16.07.2003 | |
FI | 16.07.2003 | ||
GR | 16.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 16.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4805778 (NAMBU YUKIO [JP]); | [AD]US4955728 (HEBRANK JOHN H [US]) [AD] 1,18,35 * column A *; | [A]US5900929 (HEBRANK JOHN H [US], et al) [A] 1,35 * column A * | by applicant | US3616262 | US4458630 | US4671652 | US4681063 | US4914672 | US4955728 | US5028421 | US5158038 |