EP1192447 - MULTIPLEXED FLUORESCENT DETECTION IN MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aclara BioSciences, Inc. 1288 Pear Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043-1432 / US | [2002/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHER, Kevin 14826 Skyline Boulevard Woodside, CA 94062 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Timothy 1014 Palisade Court Martinez, CA 94553 / US | 03 /
BJORNSON, Torleif 7030 Daniel Court Gilroy, CA 95020 / US | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/14] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00930713.3 | 12.05.2000 | [2002/14] | WO2000US13217 | Priority number, date | US19990133727P | 12.05.1999 Original published format: US 133727 P | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0068671 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1192447 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
G01N21/6452 (EP,US);
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
G01N21/6458 (EP,US);
B01L2200/14 (EP,US);
B01L3/5027 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6419 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6421 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6439 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6478 (EP,US);
G01N2201/101 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/14] | Title | German: | MULTIPLEXER NACHWEIS VON FLUORESZENZ IN MIKROFLUIDISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2002/14] | English: | MULTIPLEXED FLUORESCENT DETECTION IN MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES | [2002/14] | French: | DETECTION MULTIPLEX DE FLUORESCENCE DANS DES DISPOSITIFS MICROFLUIDIQUES | [2002/14] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 27.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/21] | 05.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/21] | Request for further processing for: | 17.08.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.09.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0564178 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1,3,5,15,17; | [A]WO9634278 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US])[A] 1,3,5,15,17; | [A]US5730850 (KAMBARA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,5,15,17; | [A]WO9849543 (NANOGEN INC [US]) [A] 1,3,5,15,17 | Examination | JPH03235037 | US5459325 | US5483075 | US5528050 | US5595708 |