EP1185967 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR CONTROLLING COMPUTERS OR LINKING TO INTERNET RESOURCES FROM PHYSICAL AND ELECTRONIC OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Digimarc Corporation 9405 S.W. Gemini Drive Beaverton, OR 97008 / US | [2005/19] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Digimarc Corporation Suite 250, 19801 SW 72nd Avenue Tualatin, OR 97062 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RHOADS, Geoffrey, B. 304 SW Tualatin Loop West Linn, OR 97068 / US | 02 /
RODRIGUEZ, Tony, F. 3104 NE 31st Avenue Portland, OR 97212 / US | 03 /
DAVIS, Bruce, L. 15599 Village Drive Lake Oswego, OR 97034 / US | 04 /
CARR, J., Scott 7814 SW 189th Avenue Beaverton, OR 97007 / US | 05 /
GROSSI, Brian, J. 220 Sleeper Avenue Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 06 /
MCKINLEY, Tyler, J. 17020 SW Tracy Avenue Lake Oswego, OR 97035 / US | 07 /
SEDER, Phillip, A. 1600 Palatine Street Portland, OR 97219 / US | 08 /
PERRY, Burt, W. 15344 Provincial Hill Way Lake Oswego, OR 97035 / US | 09 /
HEIN, William, C., III 151 Indiantown Road Glenmoore, PA 19343-1412 / US | 10 /
MACINTOSH, Brian, T. 1200 Fairway Road Lake Oswego, OR 97034 / US | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/11] | Meddle, Alan Leonard, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00930749.7 | 15.05.2000 | [2002/11] | WO2000US13333 | Priority number, date | US19990314648 | 19.05.1999 Original published format: US 314648 | US19990342688 | 29.06.1999 Original published format: US 342688 | US19990342689 | 29.06.1999 Original published format: US 342689 | US19990342971 | 29.06.1999 Original published format: US 342971 | US19990343101 | 29.06.1999 Original published format: US 343101 | US19990343104 | 29.06.1999 Original published format: US 343104 | US19990141468P | 29.06.1999 Original published format: US 141468 P | US19990151586P | 30.08.1999 Original published format: US 151586 P | US19990158015P | 06.10.1999 Original published format: US 158015 P | US19990163332P | 03.11.1999 Original published format: US 163332 P | US19990164619P | 10.11.1999 Original published format: US 164619 P | US20000531076 | 18.03.2000 Original published format: US 531076 | US20000543125 | 05.04.2000 Original published format: US 543125 | US20000547664 | 12.04.2000 Original published format: US 547664 | US20000552998 | 19.04.2000 Original published format: US 552998 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0070585 | Date: | 23.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1185967 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, H04N1/32 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
G07F17/26 (EP);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F16/9554 (EP);
G06Q30/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/11] | G09C5/00, G06F17/00, G06K7/00, G06K9/00, G06K9/36, G06K19/06, H04L9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODEN UND SYSTEME ZUR RECHNERSTEUERUNG ODER VERBINDUNG VON PHYSISCHEN ODER ELEKTRONISCHEN OBJEKTEN MIT INTERNET-RESOURCEN | [2002/11] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR CONTROLLING COMPUTERS OR LINKING TO INTERNET RESOURCES FROM PHYSICAL AND ELECTRONIC OBJECTS | [2002/11] | French: | PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES DE CONTROLE D'ORDINATEURS OU DE LIAISON AUX RESSOURCES INTERNET D'OBJETS PHYSIQUES ET ELECTRONIQUES | [2002/11] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 05.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/03] | 07.12.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP07122522.1 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 08.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9636163 (DIGIMARC CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 8, lines 20-31 * * page 11, lines 9-20 * * page 48, lines 16-27 * * page 69, line 26 - page 70, line 37 * * page 72, lines 2-18 * * page 100, line 33 - page 101, line 30 *; | [X]US5761686 (BLOOMBERG DAN S [US]) [X] 1-20 * column A * * column 4, lines 8-62 * * column 5, lines 11-50 * * column 7, lines 6-31 * * column 8, lines 4-63 * * column 9, lines 36-43 * * column 10, lines 58-62 * * column 11, lines 4-12 * * column 17, lines 9-14 *; | [A]EP0469868 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 1, lines 1-36 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 8 * * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 29 * * column 6, lines 33-53 *; | [A]EP0581317 (INTERACTIVE HOME SYSTEMS [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 2, lines 27-43 * * page 3, lines 6-10 * * page 3, lines 16-34 * | [X] - GAROFALAKIS J ET AL, "Digital robbery;authors are not unprotected", COMPUTER GRAPHICS INTERNATIONAL, 1998. PROCEEDINGS HANNOVER, GERMANY 22-26 JUNE 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19980622), ISBN 0-8186-8445-3, pages 558 - 563, XP010291474 [X] 1-20 * page 558 - page 559, paragraph 2 * * page 561, column R - page 562, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CGI.1998.694310 | [X] - ZHAO J, "a www service to embed and prove digital copyright watermarks", PROCEEDINGS OF EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA APPLICATIONS, SERVICES AND TECHNIQUES, LOUVAIN, BELGIUM, (19960528), vol. 2, pages 695 - 709, XP000199921 [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 696, paragraph 3 - page 699, paragraph 2 * * page 700, paragraph L - page 701 * * page 703, paragraph L - page 706 * | [A] - BENDER W ET AL, "TECHNIQUES FOR DATA HIDING", IBM SYSTEMS JOURNAL, IBM CORP. ARMONK, NEW YORK, US, (1996), vol. 35, no. 3/4, ISSN 0018-8670, pages 313 - 335, XP000635079 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 313 - page 315, column L * * page 322, column R, paragraph 3 - page 323, column R, paragraph 2 * | International search | [Y]US5761686 (BLOOMBERG DAN S [US]); | [YP]US6052486 (KNOWLTON KENNETH CHARLES [US], et al); | [AP]US5930767 (REBER WILLIAM LOUIS [US], et al); | [A]US5841886 (RHOADS GEOFFREY B [US]); | [AP]US5926550 (DAVIS DEREK L [US]); | [A]US5862260 (RHOADS GEOFFREY B [US]); | [A]US5708717 (ALASIA ALFRED [US]); | [A]US5168147 (BLOOMBERG DAN S [US]); | [A]US5278400 (APPEL JAMES J [US]) |