EP1166337 - DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qimonda AG Gustav-Heinemann-Ring 212 81739 München / DE | [2007/33] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELGER, Jürgen Lindelburger Strasse 4 A D-90602 Pyrbaum / DE | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00930992.3 | 24.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000DE00942 | Priority number, date | DE1999113628 | 25.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19913628 | [2002/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0059003 | Date: | 05.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1166337 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1166337 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H01L21/67727 (EP,US);
H01L21/02 (KR);
H01L21/67207 (EP,US);
H01L21/6773 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR FERTIGUNG VON HALBLEITERPRODUKTEN | [2002/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTS | [2002/01] | French: | INSTALLATION POUR FABRIQUER DES PRODUITS SEMICONDUCTEURS | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 24.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 07.11.2007 | NL | 07.11.2007 | IT | 31.03.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2008/48] | IE | 07.11.2007 | |
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | NL | 07.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5820679 (YOKOYAMA NATSUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 6, line 1 - column 7, line 21 * * column 12, line 61 - column 17, line 55 *; | [A]US5164905 (IWASAKI TAKEMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 56 * * column 5, line 19 - column 10, line 40 * |