EP1177422 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ACCOMMODATING SAMPLES ON CRYOSUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/06] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ACCOMMODATING SAMPLES ON CRYROSUBSTRATES | ||
[2004/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evotec Technologies GmbH Merowingerplatz 1a 40225 Düsseldorf / DE | [2004/40] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Evotec OAI AG Schnackenburgallee 114 22525 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUHR, Günter Kavalierstrasse 15 D-13187 Berlin / DE | 02 /
HAGEDORN, Rolf Wartiner Strasse 16 D-13057 Berlin / DE | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Hertz, Oliver, et al V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Hertz, Oliver, Dr., et al v. Bezold & Sozien, Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/06] | Hertz, Oliver, Dr. v. Bezold & Sozien, Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00931126.7 | 05.05.2000 | [2002/06] | WO2000EP04063 | Priority number, date | DE19991021236 | 07.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19921236 | [2002/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0068663 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1177422 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1177422 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/42, A01N1/02, F25D25/00 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
G01N1/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/46] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PROBENAUFNAHME AN KRYOSUBSTRATEN | [2002/06] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ACCOMMODATING SAMPLES ON CRYOSUBSTRATES | [2004/25] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRISE D'ECHANTILLONS SUR DES CRYOSUBSTRATS | [2002/06] |
Former [2002/06] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ACCOMMODATING SAMPLES ON CRYROSUBSTRATES | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 13.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 10.11.2004 | FR | 10.11.2004 | IE | 10.11.2004 | IT | 10.11.2004 | NL | 10.11.2004 | DK | 10.02.2005 | GR | 10.02.2005 | SE | 10.02.2005 | ES | 21.02.2005 | PT | 10.04.2005 | AT | 05.05.2005 | CY | 05.05.2005 | LU | 05.05.2005 | BE | 31.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
IT | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
AT | 05.05.2005 | ||
CY | 05.05.2005 | ||
LU | 05.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
AT | 05.05.2005 | ||
CY | 05.05.2005 | ||
LU | 05.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
AT | 05.05.2005 | ||
CY | 05.05.2005 | ||
LU | 05.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
AT | 05.05.2005 | ||
CY | 05.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
AT | 05.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/43] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
AT | 05.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 10.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5233844 (KNIPPSCHEER HERMANN [US], et al) [A] 1,11,18 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0804073 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [DA] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9843592 (CRYO CELL INT [US]) [A] 1,11,18 * abstract *; | [A]DE19716913 (MINGERS BERND DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1,11,18* abstract * |