EP1183453 - METHOD FOR DESULFURIZATION OF AT LEAST ONE NOx STORAGE CATALYST MOUNTED IN THE EXHAUST GAS DUCT OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POTT, Ekkehard Westring 33 D-38518 Gifhorn / DE | 02 /
GOTTSCHLING, Martina Eulenstr. 11 D-38114 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
HELD, Wolfgang Wilhelmstrasse 1 D-38448 Wolfsburg / DE | 04 /
HAHN, Hermann Gebr.-Grimm-Str. 37 D-38165 Lehre / DE | [2002/10] | Application number, filing date | 00931209.1 | 13.05.2000 | [2002/10] | WO2000EP04325 | Priority number, date | DE1999123481 | 21.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19923481 | [2002/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0071877 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1183453 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1183453 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/14 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
F01N3/0842 (EP);
F01N13/009 (EP);
F01N3/0814 (EP);
F02D41/028 (EP);
F02D41/0295 (EP);
F01N2570/04 (EP);
F01N2570/14 (EP);
F02D41/1408 (EP);
F02M26/15 (EP);
Y02A50/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/18] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTSCHWEFELUNG VON WENIGSTENS EINEM IN EINEM ABGASKANAL EINER VERBRENNUNGSKRAFTMASCHINE ANGEORDNETEN NOx-SPEICHERKATALYSATOR | [2002/10] | English: | METHOD FOR DESULFURIZATION OF AT LEAST ONE NOx STORAGE CATALYST MOUNTED IN THE EXHAUST GAS DUCT OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2002/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE DESULFURATION D'AU MOINS UN CATALYSEUR ACCUMULANT DU NOx, AGENCE DANS UN CONDUIT DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2002/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 20.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5758493 (ASIK JOSEPH R [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 ** column 1, line 40 - line 62 *; | [X]EP0899430 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] - [0006] - [0009] , [0013] - [0016] * * figure 1 * |