EP1103547 - FORMAZAN METAL COMPLEX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA HAYASHIBARA SEIBUTSU KAGAKU KENKYUJO 2-3 Shimoishii, 1-chome Okayama-shi, Okayama 700-0907 / JP | [2006/28] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Hayashibara Seibutsu Kagaku Kenkyujo 2-3, 1-chome, Shimoishii Okayama-shi, Okayama 700-0907 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANO, Kentaro 273-10, Tomita Okayama-shi, Okayama 700-0936 / JP | 02 /
ORITA, Katsumi 30-19, Sai Okayama-shi, Okayama 703-8242 / JP | 03 /
KAWATA, Toshio 7-5, Aoe 3-chome Okayama-shi, Okayama 700-0941 / JP | 04 /
YASUI, Shigeo 10-9, Fukushima 2-chome Okayama-shi, Okayama 702-8044 / JP | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00931653.0 | 01.06.2000 | [2001/22] | WO2000JP03565 | Priority number, date | JP19990163036 | 09.06.1999 Original published format: JP 16303699 | JP20000145313 | 17.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000145313 | [2001/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0075111 | Date: | 14.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1103547 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1103547 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/77, C07D401/14, C07D417/14, C07D405/12, G11B7/24, C07D213/86, C07D213/87, C09B50/00, C09B67/00 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
C07D213/77 (EP,US);
C07D213/86 (EP,US);
C07D213/87 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
C09B50/00 (EP,US);
C09B50/04 (EP,US);
C09B67/0033 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/22] | C07D213/77, C07D401/14, C07D417/14, C07D405/12, G11B7/24, // (C07F15/04, C09B23:00) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMAZAN-METALLKOMPLEXE | [2001/22] | English: | FORMAZAN METAL COMPLEX | [2001/22] | French: | COMPLEXE METALLIQUE DE FORMAZAN | [2001/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2001 | Translation filed | 02.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 21.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2006 | BE | 12.07.2006 | CH | 12.07.2006 | CY | 12.07.2006 | FI | 12.07.2006 | FR | 12.07.2006 | IT | 12.07.2006 | LI | 12.07.2006 | NL | 12.07.2006 | DK | 12.10.2006 | SE | 12.10.2006 | GR | 13.10.2006 | ES | 23.10.2006 | PT | 12.12.2006 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/01] | AT | 12.07.2006 | |
BE | 12.07.2006 | ||
CH | 12.07.2006 | ||
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
FR | 12.07.2006 | ||
IT | 12.07.2006 | ||
LI | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
GR | 13.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 12.07.2006 | |
BE | 12.07.2006 | ||
CH | 12.07.2006 | ||
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IT | 12.07.2006 | ||
LI | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
GR | 13.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 12.07.2006 | |
BE | 12.07.2006 | ||
CH | 12.07.2006 | ||
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IT | 12.07.2006 | ||
LI | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 12.07.2006 | |
BE | 12.07.2006 | ||
CH | 12.07.2006 | ||
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
LI | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 12.07.2006 | |
CH | 12.07.2006 | ||
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
LI | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
LI | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
LI | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
LI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
LI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CH | 12.07.2006 | |
LI | 12.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10337958 ; | [X]JPS60122195 ; | [E]WO0119923 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP], et al) [E] 11 * page 58; example 87 *; | EP1130063 [ ] (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]) [ ] * page 43; example 87 *; | [X] - YANG, GUIFA ET AL, "Complexation of 5-Br-PNPFF [1-(5'-bromo-2'-pyridyl)-5-(4'-nitrophenyl)-3- (2'-furyl)formazan] with cadmium and its application", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19880404), vol. 108, no. 14, Database accession no. 123625, XP002185827 [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [ ] - FENXI HUAXUE (1987), 15(10), 915-17 | [X] - ZUO, SHIYU ET AL, "Study of spectrophotometric determination of microamounts of copper with 5-Br-PPFF [1-(5-bromo-2-pyridyl)-5-phenyl-3-(2-furyl)formazan]", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19861020), vol. 105, no. 16, Database accession no. 145294, XP002185828 [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [ ] - KUANGYE GONGCHENG (1986), 6(2), 54-7, 65 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10337958 A 19981222 (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,11 * examples 1-20,24,25,31-33 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851107), vol. 009, no. 279, Database accession no. (M - 427), & JP60122195 A 19850629 (RICOH KK) [X] 1,2,11 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPS5948189 (RICOH KK); | [X]EP0729139 (TDK CORP [JP]); | [X]JPH08306516 (RICOH KK); | [X]EP0837462 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [XP]JPH11193266 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) |