EP1124189 - DOCUMENT SORTING METHOD, DOCUMENT SORTER, AND RECORDED MEDIUM ON WHICH DOCUMENT SORTING PROGRAM IS RECORDED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAISHI, Michihiro Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
MIWA, Shinji Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-ccome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 00931690.2 | 02.06.2000 | [2001/33] | WO2000JP03625 | Priority number, date | JP19990158498 | 04.06.1999 Original published format: JP 15849899 | JP19990212501 | 27.07.1999 Original published format: JP 21250199 | [2001/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0075810 | Date: | 14.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1124189 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
G06F16/93 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99933 (US);
Y10S707/99935 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2001/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOKUMENTENSORTIERVERFAHREN, DOKUMENTENSORTIERER UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM AUF DEM DAS DOKUMENTENSORTIERPROGRAMM AUFGENOMMEN IST | [2001/33] | English: | DOCUMENT SORTING METHOD, DOCUMENT SORTER, AND RECORDED MEDIUM ON WHICH DOCUMENT SORTING PROGRAM IS RECORDED | [2001/33] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRI DE DOCUMENTS, APPAREIL DE TRI DE DOCUMENTS ET SUPPORT ENREGISTRE SUR LEQUEL UN PROGRAMME DE TRI DE DOCUMENTS EST MEMORISE | [2001/33] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2001 | Translation filed | 28.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2001 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 16.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.01.2007 | 16.01.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/23] | 03.02.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - ZAMIR O ET AL, "WEB DOCUMENT CLUSTERING: A FEASIBILITY DEMONSTRATION", SIGIR '98. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 21ST ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL ACM-SIGIR CONFERENCE ON RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT IN INFORMATION RETRIEVAL. MELBOURNE, AUG. 24 - 28, 1998, ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL ACM-SIGIR CONFERENCE ON RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT IN INFORMATION RET, (1998), ISBN 1-58113-015-5, pages 46 - 54, XP002949043 [X] 1-5,10-13 * figure 1 * * page 48, column L - page 49, column R * [Y] 6-9 | [Y] - ZAMIR O ET AL, "GROUPER: A DYNAMIC CLUSTERING INTERFACE TO WEB SEARCH RESULTS", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990517), vol. 31, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 1361 - 1374, XP002930746 [Y] 6-9 * figure 2 * * page 1366, column L * * page 1367, column L - page 1368, column L * | [A] - WILLETT P, "RECENT TRENDS IN HIERARCHIC DOCUMENT CLUSTERING: A CRITICAL REVIEW", INFORMATION PROCESSING & MANAGEMENT, ELSEVIER, BARKING, GB, (1988), vol. 24, no. 5, ISSN 0306-4573, pages 577 - 597, XP000573921 [A] 1-13 * page 579 * * page 580 - page 582 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0306-4573(88)90027-1 | [A] - CHANG C-H ET AL, "Customizable multi-engine search tool with clustering", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970901), vol. 29, no. 8-13, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 1217 - 1224, XP004095318 [A] 1-13 * page 1220 - page 1221 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-7552(97)00053-6 | [A] - ZAMIR O ; ETZIONI O ; MADANI O ; KARP R M, "Fast and intuitive clustering of Web documents", PROCEEDINGS OF THE THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON KNOWLEDGE DISCOVERY AND DATA MINING, NEWPORT BEACH, CA, USA, (19970817), pages 287 - 290, XP002280255 [A] 1,3,10,12 * page 289, column L * | [A] - CROUCH C J ED - CHIARAMELLA Y ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, "A CLUSTER-BASED APPROACH TO THESAURUS CONSTRUCTION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT IN INFORMATION RETRIEVAL. (SIGIR). GRENOBLE, JUNE 13 - 15, 1988, NEW YORK, ACM, US, (19880613), vol. CONF. 11, pages 309 - 320, XP000295046 [A] 1,3,10,12 * page 316 - page 317 * | [A] - SALTON G ET AL, "TERM-WEIGHTING APPROACHES IN AUTOMATIC TEXT RETRIEVAL", INFORMATION PROCESSING & MANAGEMENT, ELSEVIER, BARKING, GB, (1988), vol. 24, no. 5, ISSN 0306-4573, pages 513 - 523, XP002035959 [A] 1,3,10,12 * page 516 - page 517 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0306-4573(88)90021-0 | International search | [X]JPH10162012 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y] - SHIOMI ET AL., "Thesaurus wo mochiita bunsho data no jidou bunrui hou", RESEARCH REPORT OF INFORMATION PROCESSING SOCIETY OF JAPAN (IPSJ), (JAPAN), (19970120), vol. 97, no. 4 (97-NL-117), pages 99 - 104, XP002945886 | [A] - OREN ZAMIR, OREN ETZIONI, "Grouper: A dynamic clustering interface to web search results", COMPUTER NETWORKS, (19990517), vol. 31, no. 11-16, pages 1361 - 1374, XP002930746 |