EP1180072 - METHOD FOR FORMATION OF COLOURS WITH A COLOUR PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stork Digital Imaging B.V. Handelstraat 6 5831 AV Boxmeer / NL | [2002/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELTEN, Petrus, Leonardus, Johannes Tuinfluiter 23 NL-5831 MD Boxmeer / NL | 02 /
ARJONA-GOMEZ, Fulgencio Picassohof 22 NL-5613 MC Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
HAENISCH-HABEDANK, Sigrid, Dorothea Hochstrasse 29 D-47178 Duisburg / DE | 04 /
BRAUN, Robert, Evert, Anthony Karrevracht 15 NL-5406 AG Uden / NL | [2002/08] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Johannes Cornelis Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/08] | Volmer, Johannes Cornelis Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 00931726.4 | 18.05.2000 | [2002/08] | WO2000NL00338 | Priority number, date | NL19991012085 | 18.05.1999 Original published format: NL 1012085 | [2002/08] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0069644 | Date: | 23.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1180072 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41J19/14, B41J2/21 | [2002/08] | CPC: |
B41J19/147 (EP,US);
B41J2/21 (KR);
B41J2/2132 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT [2002/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FARBEN MIT EINEM FARBDRUCKER | [2002/08] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMATION OF COLOURS WITH A COLOUR PRINTER | [2002/08] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DES COULEURS A L'AIDE D'UNE IMPRIMANTE COULEUR | [2002/08] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2000 | Translation filed | 02.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/08] | 12.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/21] | 16.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08295034 ; | [A]US4528576 (KOUMURA NOBORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,9 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 56; figure 3 * * column 7, line 9 - line 39; figure 7 *; | [A]JPH0247075 ; | [A]JPH0345351 ; | [A]EP0610096 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 2,9 * column 38, line 28 - column 45, line 58; figures 35,37 *; | [A]EP0600735 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 2,3,8,9 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 199, no. 703, & JP08295034 A 19961112 (CANON INC) [X] 1,4,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900427), vol. 014, no. 209, Database accession no. (M - 0968), & JP02047075 A 19900216 (MINOLTA CAMERA CO LTD) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910514), vol. 015, no. 186, Database accession no. (M - 1112), & JP03045351 A 19910226 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2,9 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH08295034 |