EP1212721 - A PLANT AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING FUNCTIONS IN AN ENVIRONMENT AND A USE OF SUCH A PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tentaculus Independent Living AB Studiegangen 3 831 40 Östersund / SE | [2005/16] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Örn, Bertil Frösövagen 47 832 44 Frösön / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Örn, Bertil Studiegangen 3 831 40 Östersund / SE | [2005/16] |
Former [2002/24] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Olsson, Jan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB P.O.Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Olsson, Jan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB P.O.Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | Application number, filing date | 00931807.2 | 05.05.2000 | [2002/24] | WO2000SE00891 | Priority number, date | SE19990001789 | 18.05.1999 Original published format: SE 9901789 | [2002/24] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0073966 | Date: | 07.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1212721 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G05B15/02 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
G05B19/042 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (EP,US);
G05B2219/21014 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25092 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25425 (EP,US);
G05B2219/2642 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/24] | G06F19/00, G06F13/00, G06F3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM KONTROLLIEREN VON FUNKTIONEN IN EINER UMGEBUNG UND VERWENDUNG EINER SOLCHEN ANLAGE | [2002/24] | English: | A PLANT AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING FUNCTIONS IN AN ENVIRONMENT AND A USE OF SUCH A PLANT | [2002/24] | French: | INSTALLATION ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE FONCTIONS DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT ET UTILISATION D'UNE TELLE INSTALLATION | [2002/24] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2000 | Translation filed | 12.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 12.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 28.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/21] | 09.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4497031 (FROEHLING PAUL H [US], et al) | [A] - FURUGREN, BARBRO AND ELGER GERHARD, "Smart Bo-ett fungerande hem foer funktionshindrade", AVDELNING FOER KOMMUNIKATIONSHANDIKAPP. HJAELPMEDELSINSTITUTED, (199901), pages 1 - 17, URL: http://www.hi.se/utvforsk/smartbo/smartbo.pdf, (20000809), XP002970606 | Examination | US4540890 | WO9522087 | US5689229 |