EP1187583 - PROSTHETIC FOOT HAVING SHOCK ABSORPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OHIO WILLOW WOOD COMPANY 15441 Scioto Darby Road, P.O Box 130 Mount Sterling, OH 43143 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states OHIO WILLOW WOOD COMPANY 15441 Scioto Darby Road, P.O Box 130 Mount Sterling, OH 43143 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DODDROE, Jeffrey, L. 5107 State, Route 41 North Washington Court House, OH 43160 / US | 02 /
ARBOGAST, Robert, E. 12900 State, Route 56 Southeast Mount Sterling, OH 43143 / US | 03 /
COLVIN, James, M. 3454 Anchorage Lane Hilliard, OH 43026 / US | 04 /
CAPPER, James, W. 12350 Kiousville-Palestin Road Mount Sterling, OH 43143 / US | 05 /
SRINIVASAN, Sujatha 3794 Clay Bank Hilliard, Ohio 43026 / US | [2002/26] |
Former [2002/12] | 01 /
DODDROE, Jeffrey, L. 5107 State, Route 41 North Washington Court House, OH 43160 / US | ||
02 /
ARBOGAST, Robert, E. 12900 State, Route 56 Southeast Mount Sterling, OH 43143 / US | |||
03 /
COLVIN, James, M. 3454 Anchorage Lane Hilliard, OH 43026 / US | |||
04 /
CAPPER, James, W. 12350 Kiousville-Palestin Road Mount Sterling, OH 43143 / US | |||
05 /
SRINIVASAN, Sujatha 5576 Ranchwood Drive Columbus, OH 43228 / US | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/12] | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00931935.1 | 24.05.2000 | [2002/12] | WO2000US09823 | Priority number, date | US19990135704P | 24.05.1999 Original published format: US 135704 P | US20000502455 | 11.02.2000 Original published format: US 502455 | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0071061 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1187583 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1187583 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/66 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
A61F2/66 (EP,US);
A61F2002/5003 (EP,US);
A61F2002/5072 (EP,US);
A61F2002/5079 (EP,US);
A61F2002/6657 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUSSPROTHESE MIT STOSSDÄMPFER | [2005/01] | English: | PROSTHETIC FOOT HAVING SHOCK ABSORPTION | [2002/12] | French: | PROTHESE DE PIED A EFFET D'AMORTISSEUR | [2002/12] |
Former [2002/12] | PROSTETHISCHER FUSS VERSEHEN MIT EINER SCHOCKDÄMPFUNG | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 14.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.07.2005 | CH | 27.07.2005 | CY | 27.07.2005 | FI | 27.07.2005 | IT | 27.07.2005 | LI | 27.07.2005 | DK | 27.10.2005 | GR | 27.10.2005 | ES | 07.11.2005 | PT | 27.12.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/35] | BE | 27.07.2005 | |
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
IT | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | BE | 27.07.2005 | |
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 27.07.2005 | |
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 27.07.2005 | |
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 27.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR484416 (LOUIS GEORGES ANNIERE [FR]) [X] 1,8 * page 1, line 5 - line 49 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 46,47; | [XY]US3754286 (RYAN M) [X] 1,8,52 * column 1, line 26 - column 3, line 58 * * figures 1,5 * [Y] 46,47; | [Y]WO9853769 (COLLEGE PARK IND INC [US]) [Y] 46,47 * page 13, line 7 - page 17, line 25 * * figures 13-22 *; | [A]EP0884033 (BOCK ORTHOPAED IND [DE]) [A] 1-6,18,61 * column 4, line 1 - column 7, line 45 ** figure 9 * | International search | [A]US5258039 (GOH JAMES C H [SG], et al); | [A]US5509938 (PHILLIPS VAN L [US]); | [A]US5571210 (LINDH LEIF [SE]) |