EP1177439 - SCREENING FOR IMMUNOSTIMULATORY DNA FUNCTIONAL MODIFIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/06] | SCREENING FOR IMMUNOSTIMULATORY DNA FUNCTIONAL MODIFYERS | ||
[2004/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coley Pharmaceutical GmbH Elisabeth-Selbert-Strasse 9 40764 Langenfeld / DE | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF IOWA RESEARCH FOUNDATION 214 Technology Innovation Center, Oakdale Research Campus Iowa City, IA 52242 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Coley Pharmaceutical GmbH Elisabeth-Selbert-Strasse 9 40764 Langenfeld / DE | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF IOWA RESEARCH FOUNDATION 214 Technology Innovation Center, Oakdale Research Campus Iowa City, IA 52242 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOLL, Berhard, O. Birkenstrasse 70 D-40233 Duesseldorf / DE | 02 /
SCHETTER, Christian Oerkhaushof 35 D-40723 Hilden / DE | 03 /
KRIEG, Arthur, M. 890 Park Place Iowa City, IA 52246 / US | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00931983.1 | 28.04.2000 | [2002/06] | WO2000US11697 | Priority number, date | US19990131830P | 29.04.1999 Original published format: US 131830 P | US20000186845P | 03.03.2000 Original published format: US 186845 P | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0067023 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1177439 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1177439 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, G01N33/68, C12Q1/68, C07K14/47 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
G01N33/502 (EP);
C07K14/4705 (EP);
G01N33/5008 (EP);
G01N33/5047 (EP);
G01N2333/47 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/37] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCREENING NACH MODULATOREN DER FUNKTION VON IMMUNSTIMULATORISCHER DNA | [2002/06] | English: | SCREENING FOR IMMUNOSTIMULATORY DNA FUNCTIONAL MODIFIERS | [2004/35] | French: | CRIBLAGE DE MODIFICATEURS FONCTIONNELS DE L'ADN IMMUNOSTIMULANT | [2002/06] |
Former [2002/06] | SCREENING FOR IMMUNOSTIMULATORY DNA FUNCTIONAL MODIFYERS | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 28.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/35] | Request for further processing for: | 22.08.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 22.08.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.09.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.2004 | BE | 08.09.2004 | CH | 08.09.2004 | FI | 08.09.2004 | FR | 08.09.2004 | IT | 08.09.2004 | LI | 08.09.2004 | NL | 08.09.2004 | DK | 08.12.2004 | GR | 08.12.2004 | SE | 08.12.2004 | ES | 19.12.2004 | PT | 08.02.2005 | CY | 28.04.2005 | GB | 28.04.2005 | IE | 28.04.2005 | LU | 28.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
FR | 08.09.2004 | ||
IT | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.12.2004 | ||
CY | 28.04.2005 | ||
GB | 28.04.2005 | ||
IE | 28.04.2005 | ||
LU | 28.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
FR | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.12.2004 | ||
CY | 28.04.2005 | ||
GB | 28.04.2005 | ||
IE | 28.04.2005 | ||
LU | 28.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
FR | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.12.2004 | ||
CY | 28.04.2005 | ||
GB | 28.04.2005 | ||
IE | 28.04.2005 | ||
LU | 28.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
FR | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.12.2004 | ||
CY | 28.04.2005 | ||
GB | 28.04.2005 | ||
IE | 28.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
FR | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.12.2004 | ||
GB | 28.04.2005 | ||
IE | 28.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
FR | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.12.2004 | ||
GB | 28.04.2005 | ||
IE | 28.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.12.2004 | ||
GB | 28.04.2005 | ||
IE | 28.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.12.2004 | ||
GB | 28.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
NL | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.12.2004 | ||
GB | 28.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
DK | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
BE | 08.09.2004 | ||
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/27] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
CH | 08.09.2004 | ||
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
LI | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
GR | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 08.09.2004 | |
FI | 08.09.2004 | ||
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 08.09.2004 | |
SE | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 08.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9602555 (UNIV IOWA RES FOUND [US]) [A] 1-104 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9840100 (OTTAWA CIVIC LOEB RES INST [CA], et al) [A] 1-104 * page 12 *; | [DA] - KRIEG, A.M., "The CpG Motif: Implications for Clinical Immunology", BIODRUGS, (199811), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 341 - 346, XP000949909 [DA] 1-104 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00063030-199810050-00001 | [A] - HÄCKER, H. ET AL., "CpG-DNA-specific activation of antigen-presenting cells requires stress kinase activity and is preceded by non-specific endocytosis and endosomal maturation", THE EMBO JOURNAL, (19981102), vol. 17, no. 21, pages 6230 - 6240, XP000946495 [A] 1-104 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/17.21.6230 | [DA] - KRIEG A M ET AL, "CPG MOTIFS IN BACTERIAL DNA TRIGGER DIRECT B-CELL ACTIVATION", NATURE,GB,MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, (19950406), vol. 374, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 546 - 549, XP000197060 [DA] 1-104 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/374546a0 |