EP1175315 - A VALVED DISPENSING SYSTEM WITH HYDRAULIC HAMMER PROTECTION FOR THE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seaquist Closures Foreign, Inc. 475 West Terra Cotta Crystal Lake, Illinois 60014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states Seaquist Closures Foreign, Inc 475 West Terra Cotta Crystal Lake Illinois 60014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESS, John, M., III 5105 Amberwood Ct. Midland, MI 48640 / US | 02 /
SOCIER, Timothy, R. 1700 Prairie St. Essexville, MI 48732 / US | 03 /
TUCKEY, Steven, R. 1702 Prairie St. Essexville, MI 48732 / US | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Groening, Hans Wilhelm Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Groening, Hans Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00931989.8 | 01.05.2000 | [2002/05] | WO2000US11771 | Priority number, date | US19990306270 | 06.05.1999 Original published format: US 306270 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0068038 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175315 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/00, B60R9/00, E03B3/00, E03C1/00, F17D3/00, B65D47/20, A45F3/16, A47G21/18 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
B65D75/5883 (EP,US);
B05B11/0072 (EP,US);
B65D47/2031 (EP,US);
B65D47/2062 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7885 (EP,US);
Y10T137/88054 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/05] | B60R11/00, B60R9/00, E03B3/00, E03C1/00, F17D3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | EIN VENTILGESTEUERTES VERTEILSYSTEM MIT SCHUTZ DES VENTILS VOR WASSERSCHLÄGEN | [2002/05] | English: | A VALVED DISPENSING SYSTEM WITH HYDRAULIC HAMMER PROTECTION FOR THE VALVE | [2002/05] | French: | SYSTEME DISTRIBUTEUR A SOUPAPE POURVUE D'UNE PROTECTION CONTRE LES COUPS DE BELIER | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 27.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/14] | 09.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4941598 (LAMBELET JR LAWRENCE E [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 52 - line 60; figures 6,7 *; | [A]US5601207 (PACZONAY JOSEPH R [US]) [A] 1* figures 1-8A * | International search | [A]US1120901 (BUCKLAND CHARLES [GB]); | [A]US2913749 (AYRES JOHN E); | [A]US5730336 (LERNER ROBERT A [US]); | [AP]US5904275 (SUFFA UDO [DE]) |