EP1203057 - SELF-POLISHING MARINE ANTIFOULING PAINT COMPOSITION CONTAINING BLOCKED ACID FUNCTIONAL CO-POLYMERS AND FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hempel A/S Lundtoftevej 150 2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states HEMPEL A/S Lundtoftevej 150 2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK | ||
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states J.C. HEMPEL'S SKIBSFARVE-FABRIK A/S Lundtoftevej 150 DK-2800 Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CODOLAR, Santiago Arias Diputaci(RTM), 27 6e 4a E-08015 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
ELBRO, Helle, Simon Nordvad 30 DK-2860 Soborg / DK | 03 /
PEDERSEN, Michael, Stanley Mariendalsvej 48B, 4. tv. DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK | 04 /
GLADWIN, Tim, Scott Forhabningsholms Allé 15, 2. tv. DK-1904 Frederiksberg C / DK | 05 /
BUCHWALD, Frants Odden Praestegard, Praestestraede 7 DK-4583 Sjaellands Odde / DK | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2004/32] |
Former [2002/19] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sankt Annae Plads 11 P.O.Box 3007 1021 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 00934949.9 | 09.06.2000 | [2002/19] | WO2000DK00314 | Priority number, date | DK19990000832 | 11.06.1999 Original published format: DK 83299 | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0077103 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1203057 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1203057 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/16, C09D157/06 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
C09D5/165 (EP);
C09D5/1687 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTPOLIERENDE ANWUCHSVERHINDERNDE ANSTRICHFARBE FÜR WASSERFAHRZEUGE-ENTHALTEND BLOCKIERTE SÄUREFUNKTIONELLE COPOLYMERE UND FASERN | [2002/19] | English: | SELF-POLISHING MARINE ANTIFOULING PAINT COMPOSITION CONTAINING BLOCKED ACID FUNCTIONAL CO-POLYMERS AND FIBRES | [2002/19] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PEINTURE ANTISALISSURES MARINE AUTOPOLISSABLE CONTENANT DES COPOLYMERES A FONCTION ACIDE SEQUENCES ET DES FIBRES | [2002/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 24.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.02.2005 | BE | 02.02.2005 | CH | 02.02.2005 | ES | 02.02.2005 | FI | 02.02.2005 | FR | 02.02.2005 | IT | 02.02.2005 | LI | 02.02.2005 | NL | 02.02.2005 | DK | 02.05.2005 | GR | 02.05.2005 | SE | 02.05.2005 | CY | 09.06.2005 | GB | 09.06.2005 | IE | 09.06.2005 | LU | 09.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | PT | 02.07.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
ES | 02.02.2005 | ||
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
FR | 02.02.2005 | ||
IT | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
CY | 09.06.2005 | ||
GB | 09.06.2005 | ||
IE | 09.06.2005 | ||
LU | 09.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
ES | 02.02.2005 | ||
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
FR | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
CY | 09.06.2005 | ||
GB | 09.06.2005 | ||
IE | 09.06.2005 | ||
LU | 09.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
ES | 02.02.2005 | ||
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
FR | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
CY | 09.06.2005 | ||
GB | 09.06.2005 | ||
IE | 09.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
ES | 02.02.2005 | ||
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
FR | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
GB | 09.06.2005 | ||
IE | 09.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
FR | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
GB | 09.06.2005 | ||
IE | 09.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
FR | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
IE | 09.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
IE | 09.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
IE | 09.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 02.02.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2084167 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD)[A] 1-32; | [Y]EP0232006 (ICI PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-32; | [Y]WO9109915 (COURTAULDS COATINGS HOLDINGS [GB]) [Y] 1-32; | [Y]WO9615198 (HEMPELS SKIBSFARVE FAB J C [DK], et al) [Y] 1-32 |