EP1185541 - CATALYST SYSTEM ON THE BASIS OF FULVENE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/11] | CATALYST SYSTEM ON THE BASIS OF FULVEN COMPOUNDS | ||
[2002/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2002/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKHAUS, Rüdiger Lüntjenweg 48 26131 Oldenburg / DE | 02 /
HEINRICHS, Jürgen Seilerstr. 69 46047 Oberhausen / DE | 03 /
BECKE, Sigurd Vierkotter Feld 15 51503 Rösrath / DE | 04 /
KAHLERT, Steffen Gisbertstr. 1 51061 Köln / DE | [2002/11] | Application number, filing date | 00935039.8 | 16.05.2000 | [2002/11] | WO2000EP04425 | Priority number, date | DE1999124176 | 27.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19924176 | [2002/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0073315 | Date: | 07.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1185541 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1185541 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07F17/00, C08F10/00, C08F4/76, C08F10/02 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
C07F17/00 (EP);
C07F7/28 (EP);
C08F10/00 (EP);
C08F110/02 (EP);
C08F36/00 (EP);
C08F2420/04 (EP);
C08F4/65912 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/639 (EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/6592 (EP);
C08F110/02, C08F4/65912 (EP);
C08F36/00, C08F4/62 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/03] |
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KATALYSATORSYSTEM AUF BASIS VON FULVENVERBINDUNGEN | [2002/11] | English: | CATALYST SYSTEM ON THE BASIS OF FULVENE COMPOUNDS | [2002/17] | French: | SYSTEME CATALYSEUR A BASE DE COMPOSES FULVENE | [2002/11] |
Former [2002/11] | CATALYST SYSTEM ON THE BASIS OF FULVEN COMPOUNDS | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 26.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9924445 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1,8,9,11 * page 15 - page 26; examples 1-15 * |