EP1114092 - RUBBER COMPOSITION FOR TYRE, BASED ON DIENE ELASTOMER AND A REINFORCING TITANIUM OXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states Sociéte de Technologie Michelin 23 rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | ||
For all designated states MICHELIN RECHERCHE ET TECHNIQUE S.A. 10-12, route Louis-Braille CH-1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUSTODERO, Emmanuel 5, rue Diderot F-63400 Chamalières / FR | 02 /
SIMONOT, Laure 68, rue de Wailly F-63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | 03 /
TARDIVAT, Jean-Claude 7, rue du Docteur Chibret F-63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Ribière, Joel Michelin & Cie Service SGD/LG/PI-LAD 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | Ribière, Joel Michelin & Cie Service SGD/LG/PI-LAD 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00935098.4 | 23.05.2000 | [2001/28] | WO2000EP04682 | Priority number, date | FR19990006854 | 28.05.1999 Original published format: FR 9906854 | [2001/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0073373 | Date: | 07.12.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1114092 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1114092 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/22, C08L21/00, B60C1/00 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
B60C1/0025 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/36 (KR);
B60C1/0016 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/04 (KR);
C08K3/10 (KR);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (KR);
C08L23/16 (KR);
C08K2003/2237 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/32] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR REIFEN, BASIEREND AUF EINEM DIENELASTOMER UND EINEM VERSTÄRKENDEN TITANOXYD | [2001/28] | English: | RUBBER COMPOSITION FOR TYRE, BASED ON DIENE ELASTOMER AND A REINFORCING TITANIUM OXIDE | [2001/28] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC POUR PNEUMATIQUE, A BASE D'ELASTOMERE DIENIQUE ET D'UN OXYDE DE TITANE RENFORCANT | [2001/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 19.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.08.2003 | NL | 06.08.2003 | ES | 17.11.2003 | [2007/35] |
Former [2004/46] | NL | 06.08.2003 | |
ES | 17.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 06.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB653814 (SPOLEK) [A] 1 * page 1, line 16 - line 27; example -; claim - *; | [DA]EP0697432 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0735088 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0810258 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR]) [AD] 1 * abstract * * page 2, line 53 - page 3, line 15 *; | [AP]WO9928376 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [AP] 1 * abstract * |