EP1190418 - USE OF Cu-PHTHALOCYANINE SULFONAMIDES AS A DYE FOR WRITE-ONCE OPTICAL DATA STORAGE MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2002/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUDER, Friedrich-Karl Bodelschwinghstrasse 20 D-47800 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
RICHTER, Rolf Heymannstrasse 67 D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
HAESE, Wilfried Osenauerstrasse 32 D-51519 Odenthal / DE | 04 /
STAWITZ, Josef-Walter Am Hagen 1 D-51519 Odenthal / DE | 05 /
VESPER, Reiner Am Gemeindeberg 13 D-42799 Leichlingen / DE | 06 /
BERNETH, Horst Erfurterstrasse 1 D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2002/13] | Application number, filing date | 00935152.9 | 31.05.2000 | [2002/13] | WO2000EP04968 | Priority number, date | DE1999125712 | 07.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19925712 | [2002/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0075922 | Date: | 14.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1190418 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1190418 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, C09B47/24, B41M5/26, C09B47/26 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
G11B7/248 (EP,KR);
C09B47/26 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON Cu-PHTHALOCYANINSULFONSÄUREAMIDEN ALS DYE FÜR EINMAL BESCHREIBBARE OPTISCHE DATENSPEICHER | [2002/13] | English: | USE OF Cu-PHTHALOCYANINE SULFONAMIDES AS A DYE FOR WRITE-ONCE OPTICAL DATA STORAGE MEANS | [2002/13] | French: | UTILISATION D'AMIDES D'ACIDE SULFONIQUE DE Cu-PHTALOCYANINE COMME COLORANT POUR MEMOIRE DE DONNEES OPTIQUE ENREGISTRABLE UNE SEULE FOIS | [2002/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 04.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 23.04.2003 | IE | 23.04.2003 | CY | 31.05.2003 | LU | 31.05.2003 | MC | 31.05.2003 | GR | 23.07.2003 | PT | 23.07.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
CY | 31.05.2003 | ||
LU | 31.05.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
CY | 31.05.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 23.07.2003 | |
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | PT | 23.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0569673 ; | [A]JPS63191690 ; | [A]US4379710 (CROUNSE NATHAN N) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0519395 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1 * example 2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE4310917 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 10 - line 34; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5489330 (WUNDERLICH KLAUS [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930721), vol. 17, no. 389, & JP05069673 A 19930323 (TAIYO YUDEN) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 37, Database accession no. 1988-261810, XP002150757 & JPS63191690 A 19880809 (TOSHIBA) [A] 1 * abstract * |