EP1186203 - BENDING WAVE ACOUSTIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New Transducers Limited 37 Ixworth Place London SW3 3QH / GB | [2002/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANK, Graham 8 Fynn Road, Martlesham Woodbridge, Suffolk IP12 4LS / GB | 02 /
HARRIS, Neil 2 Station Road Whittlesford, Cambridge CB2 4NL / GB | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Hill, Justin John, et al Ipulse (IP) Ltd. Carrington House 126-130 Regent Street London W1B 5SE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Maguire, Peter Albert, et al Maguire Boss, 5 Crown Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 00935350.9 | 07.06.2000 | [2002/11] | WO2000GB02054 | Priority number, date | GB19990013465 | 10.06.1999 Original published format: GB 9913465 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0078090 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1186203 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1186203 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04R7/04, H04R1/40 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
H04R7/045 (EP);
H04R1/403 (EP);
H04R7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/30] |
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIEGEWELLEN-AKUSTISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2002/11] | English: | BENDING WAVE ACOUSTIC DEVICE | [2002/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF ACOUSTIQUE | [2002/11] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 06.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.07.2003 | [2007/35] | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9709842 (VERITY GROUP PLC [GB], et al) [AD] 1-12 * page 24, line 18 - page 30, line 5; figure - *; | [AD]US3347335 (WATTERS BILL G, et al) [AD] 1-12 * column 1, line 10 - column 4, line 10; figure - *; | [PX]WO9941939 (NEW TRANSDUCERS LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1 * page 3, line 20 - page 12, line 13; figure - * |