EP1196776 - FLUORESCENT INTENSITY METHOD FOR ASSAYING BINDING BETWEEN PROTEINS OR PEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingeneus Inc. c/o Deloitte Corporate Services 40A Central American Boulevard Belize City / BZ | [2006/16] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states Ingeneus Corporation Trident House, Broad Street Bridgetown / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERIKSON, Glen, H. PO Box 3001 Nassau / BS | 02 /
DAKSIS, Jasmine, I. 36 Cartier Crescent Richmond Hill, Ontario L4C 2N2 / CA | [2006/18] |
Former [2002/16] | 01 /
ERIKSON, Glen, H. PO Box 799 Providenciales Turks&Caicos Islands British West Indies / TC | ||
02 /
DAKSIS, Jasmine, I. 36 Cartier Crescent Richmond Hill, Ontario L4C 2N2 / CA | Representative(s) | Elend, Almut Susanne, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Elend, Almut Susanne, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | ||
Former [2002/16] | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00935446.5 | 20.06.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000IB00842 | Priority number, date | US19990344525 | 25.06.1999 Original published format: US 344525 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0101138 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1196776 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1196776 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/542 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
G01N33/542 (EP,US);
Y10S435/81 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUORESZENZINTENSTITÄTSMETHODE ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER BINDUNG ZWISCHEN PROTEINEN ODER PEPTIDEN | [2002/16] | English: | FLUORESCENT INTENSITY METHOD FOR ASSAYING BINDING BETWEEN PROTEINS OR PEPTIDES | [2002/16] | French: | PROCEDE BASE SUR UNE INTENSITE FLUORESCENTE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER UNE LIAISON ENTRE DES PROTEINES OU DES PEPTIDES | [2002/16] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 16.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Request for further processing for: | 21.03.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2006 | BE | 23.08.2006 | CH | 23.08.2006 | CY | 23.08.2006 | FI | 23.08.2006 | FR | 23.08.2006 | IT | 23.08.2006 | LI | 23.08.2006 | NL | 23.08.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | SE | 23.11.2006 | DE | 24.11.2006 | GR | 24.11.2006 | ES | 04.12.2006 | PT | 24.01.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
FR | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
DE | 24.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
DE | 24.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
DE | 24.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
DE | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
LI | 23.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4207075 (LIBURDY ROBERT P [US]) [A] 1-20 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO8707955 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]) [A] 1,20 * page 40, line 32 - page 41, line 21; example 4 *; | [A]US5334537 (LEE CHENG S [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9515981 (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 13, line 11 - page 14, line 12; example 2 *; | [A] - EFTINK M R, "FLUORESCENCE TECHNIQUES FOR STUDYING PROTEIN STRUCTURE", METHODS OF BIOCHEMICAL ANALYSIS, (1991), pages 127 - 206, XP000961784 [A] 1,20 * page 175 - page 176 * * page 189, paragraph 4 * | [A] - HOLBROOK J J ET AL, "MALATE DEHYDROGENASE PART 10 FLUORESCENCE MICRO TITRATION STUDIES OF D MALATE HYDROXY MALONATE AND NAD BINDING BY MITOCHONDRIAL AND SUPERNATANT PORCINE HEART ENZYMES", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1972), vol. 11, no. 13, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 2499 - 2502, XP000960751 [A] 1,20 * page 2499, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 2500, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00763a018 |