EP1207833 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH IMPROVED LIQUID-HANDLING ABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2012 | Revocation of patent | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [2002/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUIDOTTI, Ted Anneholmsgatan 10 S-412 67 Göteborg / SE | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Romare, Laila Anette, et al Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Romare, Laila Anette, et al Albihns Göteborg AB Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 00935776.5 | 12.05.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000SE00946 | Priority number, date | SE19990001942 | 28.05.1999 Original published format: SE 9901942 | [2002/22] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0076445 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1207833 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1207833 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/535 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
A61F13/5323 (EP,US);
A61F13/535 (EP,US);
A61F13/53708 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530445 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53721 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53778 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/34] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT VERBESSERTER RÜCKHALTEFÄHIGKEIT FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2002/22] | English: | ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH IMPROVED LIQUID-HANDLING ABILITY | [2002/22] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT AVEC CAPACITE DE TRAITEMENT DE LIQUIDES AMELIOREE | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2000 | Translation filed | 20.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 07.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah WI 54956 / US Opponent's representative Chiva, Andrew Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah WI 54956 / US Opponent's representative Chiva, Andrew Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2008/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah WI 54956 / US Opponent's representative Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54957-0349 / US Opponent's representative Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | 22.06.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.10.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.09.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.11.2011 | 28.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.11.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2004 | FI | 18.08.2004 | GR | 18.11.2004 | ES | 29.11.2004 | PT | 18.01.2005 | CY | 12.05.2005 | IE | 12.05.2005 | LU | 12.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | SE | 13.05.2010 | BE | 31.05.2010 | CH | 31.05.2010 | DK | 31.05.2010 | LI | 31.05.2010 | NL | 01.12.2010 | [2011/19] |
Former [2011/17] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
PT | 18.01.2005 | ||
CY | 12.05.2005 | ||
IE | 12.05.2005 | ||
LU | 12.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
SE | 13.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
PT | 18.01.2005 | ||
CY | 12.05.2005 | ||
IE | 12.05.2005 | ||
LU | 12.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
SE | 13.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
PT | 18.01.2005 | ||
CY | 12.05.2005 | ||
IE | 12.05.2005 | ||
LU | 12.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2008/03] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
PT | 18.01.2005 | ||
CY | 12.05.2005 | ||
IE | 12.05.2005 | ||
LU | 12.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
CY | 12.05.2005 | ||
IE | 12.05.2005 | ||
LU | 12.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
CY | 12.05.2005 | ||
IE | 12.05.2005 | ||
LU | 12.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
CY | 12.05.2005 | ||
IE | 12.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
IE | 12.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
IE | 12.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 18.08.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9822067 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) |