EP1194173 - X-RAY GUIDED DRUG DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY Office of Technology Transfer Suite 210 1207 17th Avenue South Nashville, TN 37212 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states Vanderbilt University Office of Technology Transfer, Suite 210, 1207 17th Avenue South Nashville, TN 37212 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALLAHAN, Dennis, E. 4214 Estes Road Nashville, TN 37215 / US | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Behnisch, Werner ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Behnisch, Werner Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/15] | Behnisch, Werner, Dr. Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00935839.1 | 28.04.2000 | [2002/15] | WO2000US11485 | Priority number, date | US19990302456 | 29.04.1999 Original published format: US 302456 | [2002/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0066182 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1194173 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/00, A61K49/00, A01N63/00, C12Q1/68, C12N15/85, C12N15/63, C07H21/04, A61K51/12, A61K41/00 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
A61K41/0038 (EP,US);
A61K51/1203 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/15] | A61K51/00, A61K49/00, A01N63/00, C12Q1/68, C12N15/85, C12N15/63, C07H21/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/15] | Title | German: | ROENTGENSTRAHLENGESTEUERTE ARZNEIMITTELFREIGABE | [2002/15] | English: | X-RAY GUIDED DRUG DELIVERY | [2002/15] | French: | ADMINISTRATION DE MEDICAMENT GUIDEE PAR RAYON X | [2002/15] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 28.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/24] | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9625947 (ARCH DEV CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [X]US5093104 (KAMINSKY DEBORAH [US]) [X] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0229718 (AMERSHAM INT PLC [GB]) [X] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [X]US4619823 (YOKOYAMA AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [X]DE2621311 (ABRAMOVICI J [BE], et al) [X] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9306835 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]) [X] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9533496 (DIATECH INC [US]) [X] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [X]WO8605693 (SCRIPPS CLINIC RES [US]) [X] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9612956 (WATSON CLINIC FOUNDATION [US]) [X] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9320229 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5292524 (MALE ROXANNE [US], et al); | [X]US5693627 (SCHIEVEN GARY L [US]); | [Y]US5759542 (GUREWICH VICTOR [US]); | [Y]US5334369 (HALUSHKA PERRY V [US], et al); | [X] - BENDER ET AL., "Enhancement of monoclonal antibody efficacy: The effect of external beam radiation", HYBRIDOMA,, (199502), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 129 - 134, XP002932028 | [X] - BENDER ET AL., "External beam radiation enhances antibody mediated radiocytotoxicity in humans cells in vitro", ANTICANCER RESEARCH,, (199703), vol. 17, pages 1797 - 1802, XP002932029 | [X] - WEICHSELBAUM ET AL., "Gene therapy targeted by radiation preferentially radiosensitizes tumor cells", CANCER RESEARCH,, (19940815), vol. 54, pages 4266 - 4269, XP002932030 | [Y] - ROSENBERG ET AL., "Destruction of human lymphoid tissue-culture cell lines by human peripheral lymphocytes in 51Cr-release cellular cytotoxicity assays", JOURNAL OF THE NATIONAL CANCER INSTITUTE,, (197402), vol. 52, no. 2, pages 345 - 352, XP002932031 | [Y] - SONG ET AL., "Combined cytolytic effect of X irradiation and cell-mediated immune reactions on tumor cells in vitro", RADIOLOGY,, (197401), vol. 111, pages 213 - 214, XP002932032 | [Y] - STRATTON ET AL., "Imaging arterial thrombosis: Comparison of technetium-99m-labeled monoclonal antifibrin antibodies and indium-111-platelets", J. NUCL. MED.,, (1994), vol. 35, pages 1731 - 1737, XP002932033 | [Y] - HIRATA ET AL., "Fate of intravenously injected human tumor cells in the lung of nude mice following whole-body X-irradiation", INVASION METASTASIS,, (198501), vol. 5, pages 61 - 70, XP002932034 | [Y] - HIRATA ET AL., "Artificial metastases and decrease of fibrinolysis in the nude mouse lung after hemithoracic irradiation", CLINICAL EXPERIMENTAL METASTASIS,, (198404), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 311 - 319, XP002932035 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00135170 | [Y] - HALLAHAN ET AL., "E-selectin gene induction by ionizing radiation is independent of cytokine induction", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS,, (19951226), vol. 217, no. 3, pages 784 - 795, XP002932036 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1995.2841 |