EP1176916 - SYSTEM FOR SPINAL FIXATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/06] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SPINAL FIXATION | ||
[2013/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states K2M, Inc. 751 Miller Drive, SE, Suite F-1 Leesburg, VA 20175 / US | [2010/37] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Highgate Orthopedics, Inc. One Walnut Street Boston, MA 02109 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARL, Allen 308 Highgate Drive Slingerlands, NY 12159 / US | 02 /
HART, Rickey, D. 11 Hillsdale Road Plainville, MA 02762 / US | 03 /
WINKLER, Josef, K. 2318 Gring Drive Reading, PA 19609 / US | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/06] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00935901.9 | 10.05.2000 | [2002/06] | WO2000US12773 | Priority number, date | US19990133356P | 10.05.1999 Original published format: US 133356 P | US20000536732 | 28.03.2000 Original published format: US 536732 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0067651 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1176916 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1176916 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
A61B17/15 (EP,US);
A61B17/1642 (EP,US);
A61B17/1671 (EP,US);
A61B17/1757 (EP,US);
A61B17/320016 (EP,US);
A61B17/70 (EP,US);
A61B17/7083 (EP,US);
A61B17/92 (EP,US);
A61F2/4455 (EP,US);
A61F2/4611 (EP,US);
A61B17/1604 (EP,US);
A61B17/7011 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0256 (EP,US);
A61B2090/08021 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/06] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR WIRBELSÄULENSTABILISIERUNG | [2013/03] | English: | SYSTEM FOR SPINAL FIXATION | [2013/03] | French: | SYSTEME DE FIXATION DU RACHIS | [2013/03] |
Former [2002/06] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR WIRBELSÄULENSTABILISIERUNG | ||
Former [2002/06] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SPINAL FIXATION | ||
Former [2002/06] | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE FIXATION DU RACHIS | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 21.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.07.2013 | BE | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | DK | 10.07.2013 | FI | 10.07.2013 | IT | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | NL | 10.07.2013 | SE | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | ES | 21.10.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | [2015/09] |
Former [2014/24] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 07.06.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 07.06.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 07.06.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 07.06.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 11.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5030220 (HOWLAND ROBERT S [US]) [X] 30-33 * figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 13 *; | [X]US4790303 (STEFFEE ARTHUR D [US]) [X] 30-33 * figures 1,4-6 * * column 2, line 24 - line 68 *; | [X]US5591235 (KUSLICH STEPHEN D [US]) [X] 30-33 * figures 1,2,15,17 * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 8 *; | [X]US5545164 (HOWLAND ROBERT S [US]) [X] 30-33 * figure 46 *; | [X]US5415661 (HOLMES DAVID C [US]) [X] 30-33 * figures 1A,2,3 *; | [X]US4773402 (ASHER MARC A [US], et al) [X] 30-33 * figures 1,11 * | International search | [X]US4790303 (STEFFEE ARTHUR D [US]); | [X]US5591235 (KUSLICH STEPHEN D [US]); | [A]US4773402 (ASHER MARC A [US], et al); | [A]US5415661 (HOLMES DAVID C [US]); | [A]US5545164 (HOWLAND ROBERT S [US]); | [A]US5591165 (JACKSON ROGER P [US]) |