EP1183917 - RACK MOUNTING BRACKET AND APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING A RACK MOUNTABLE UNIT IN A RACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Sun Microsystems, Inc. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | ||
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haworth, Stephen P. 15 Quarrendon Road Amersham, Buckinghamshire HP7 9EB / GB | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Harris, Ian Richard D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00935994.4 | 16.05.2000 | [2002/10] | WO2000US13441 | Priority number, date | US19990326919 | 07.06.1999 Original published format: US 326919 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0076285 | Date: | 14.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1183917 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1183917 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
H05K7/1421 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/32] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSBÜGEL FÜR EINEN BAUGRUPPENTRÄGER UND GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINER BAUGRUPPE IN EINEM BAUGRUPPENTRÄGER | [2002/10] | English: | RACK MOUNTING BRACKET AND APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING A RACK MOUNTABLE UNIT IN A RACK | [2002/10] | French: | SUPPORT DE MONTAGE DE BATI ET DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE MONTAGE D'UNE UNITE POUVANT SE MONTER DANS UN BATI | [2002/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 04.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0819972 ; | [A]US4081979 (DAWSON RAYMOND B) [A] 1,17,35 * the whole document *; | [A]FR930671 (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE) [A] 1,17,35 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19643283 (GEZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,17,35 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08019972 A 19960123 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,17,35 * abstract * |