EP1187931 - 49 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES, INC. 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville, MD 20850-3338 / US | For all designated states Rosen, Craig A. 22400 Rolling Hill Road Laytonsville, MD 20882 / US | [2002/44] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states Human Genome Sciences 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville, Maryland 20850 / US | ||
For all designated states Rosen, Craig A. 22400 Rolling Hill Road Laytonsville, MD 20882 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSEN, Craig, A. 22400 Rolling Hill Road Laytonsville, MD 20882 / US | 02 /
RUBEN, Steven, M. 18528 Heritage Hills Drive Laytonsville, MD 20882 / US | 03 /
KOMATSOULIS, George, A. 9518 Garwood Street Silver Spring, MD 20901 / US | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/12] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00936428.2 | 01.06.2000 | [2002/12] | WO2000US14928 | Priority number, date | US19990138633P | 11.06.1999 Original published format: US 138633 P | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0077237 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1187931 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/06 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 49 HUMANE SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE | [2002/12] | English: | 49 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS | [2002/12] | French: | 49 PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES | [2002/12] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/53] | 22.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9533480 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US]) [X] 1-3,6-11,14-18,20-22 * SEQ ID NO: 43; page 11, lines 9-24 *; | [X] - THE SANGER CENTRE (UK) AND THE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY GENOME SEQUENCING CENTER (USA), "Toward a complete human genome sequence.", GENOME RESEARCH, (199811), vol. 8, no. 11, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 1097 - 1108, XP002169000 [X] 1-3,6,7 | [X] - EMBL, (20010926), Database accession no. AC096723, XP002240764 [X] 1-3,6,7 * abstract * | [PX] - MAHAIRAS G G ET AL, "SEQUENCE-TAGGED CONNECTORS: A SEQUENCE APPROACH TO MAPPING AND SCANNING THE HUMAN GENOME", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199908), vol. 96, no. 17, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9739 - 9744, XP002175436 [PX] 1-3,6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.17.9739 | [X] - NCBI, (19980622), Database accession no. AQ024145, XP002240765 [X] 1-3,6,7 * abstract * | [PX] - NCBI, (19990817), Database accession no. AL109936, XP002240766 [PX] 1-6 | International search | [A]WO9401548 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) |