EP1239359 - THE HEAT-RADIATOR OF A PORTABLE COMPUTER'S CPU [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wang, Jiung-Jung 10 F. No. 15, Sec. 2, Keelung Road, Shin Yi Chiu Taipei City Taiwan / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Wang, Jiung-Jung 10 F. No. 15, Sec. 2, Keelung Road, Shin Yi Chiu Taipei City, Taiwan / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Metz, Paul, et al Cabinet Metz Patni 1a Place Boecler B.P. 10063 67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Metz, Paul, et al Cabinet Metz Patni 1a Place Boecler B.P. 10063 67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [2002/37] | Metz, Paul, et al Cabinet METZ PATNI, 63, rue de la Ganzau 67100 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 00936595.8 | 09.06.2000 | [2002/37] | WO2000CN00150 | Priority number, date | CN1999213741 | 11.06.1999 Original published format: CN 99213741 | CN1999214288 | 21.06.1999 Original published format: CN 99214288 | CN1999214382 | 25.06.1999 Original published format: CN 99214382 | [2002/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0077601 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1239359 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/20 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
G06F1/203 (EP,US);
G06F1/20 (KR);
H01L23/467 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIE WÄRMESTRAHLUNG EINES TRAGBAREN RECHNERS CPU | [2002/37] | English: | THE HEAT-RADIATOR OF A PORTABLE COMPUTER'S CPU | [2002/37] | French: | DISSIPATEUR THERMIQUE POUR UNE UNITE CENTRALE D'UN ORDINATEUR PORTABLE | [2002/37] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2001 | Translation filed | 26.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 26.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH10228335 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH10289036 (NEC CORP) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *; | [Y]US5424913 (SWINDLER DAN [US]) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, line 14 - column 6, line 30; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]WO9400727 (PCUBID COMPUTER TECH [US]) [Y] 1-5 * page 1, line 5 - page 11, line 31; figures 1-10 *; | [Y]US5522700 (HONG CHEN FU-IN [TW]) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 59; figures 1-13 *; | [Y]US5559674 (KATSUI TADASHI [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, line 18 - column 13, line 61; figures 1-18b *; | [Y]US5867365 (CHIOU MING CHIN [TW]) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5805417 (NAKAGAWA TSUYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5513070 (XIE HONG [US], et al); | [A]US5682948 (BOCK UWE [DE]); | [A]CN1167934 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US5272599 (KOENEN DAVID J [US]); | [X]US5353863 (YU CHI T [TW]) |