EP1192019 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR MEASURING AND REGULATING THE FLOW RATE OF A LIQUID METAL IN A CONTINUOUS CASTING INGOT MOULD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS- 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARNIER, Marcel La Grivolée F-38410 Saint Martin d'Uriage / FR | 02 /
ERNST, Roland 8, rue Pasteur F-38610 Gières / FR | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel Cabinet Michel de Beaumont 1, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | de Beaumont, Michel Cabinet Michel de Beaumont 1, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 00936984.4 | 30.05.2000 | [2002/14] | WO2000FR01485 | Priority number, date | FR19990007021 | 31.05.1999 Original published format: FR 9907021 | [2002/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0072996 | Date: | 07.12.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1192019 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1192019 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/10, B22D11/16 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
B22D11/16 (EP);
B22D11/115 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG UND REGULIERING DER FLIESSGESCHWINDIGKEIT EINES FLÜSSIGEN METALLS IN EINER STRANGGIESSKOKILLE | [2002/14] | English: | METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR MEASURING AND REGULATING THE FLOW RATE OF A LIQUID METAL IN A CONTINUOUS CASTING INGOT MOULD | [2002/14] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE MESURE ET DE REGULATION DE LA VITESSE D'ECOULEMENT D'UN METAL LIQUIDE DANS UNE LINGOTIERE DE COULEE CONTINUE | [2002/14] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 12.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.07.2003 | CY | 30.07.2003 | FI | 30.07.2003 | IE | 30.07.2003 | NL | 30.07.2003 | DK | 30.10.2003 | GR | 30.10.2003 | ES | 10.11.2003 | PT | 30.12.2003 | [2007/08] |
Former [2004/46] | AT | 30.07.2003 | |
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
IE | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
ES | 10.11.2003 | ||
PT | 30.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 30.07.2003 | |
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
IE | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
PT | 30.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 30.07.2003 | |
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
IE | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 30.07.2003 | |
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 30.07.2003 | |
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 30.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0265796 (ASEA AB [SE]) [A] 1,4,5* the whole document *; | [A]EP0489202 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4,5 * figure 6 *; | [A]EP0550785 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * |