EP1204111 - ENCRYPTION METHOD AND EQUIPMENT, DECRYPTION EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/19] | RECORDING MEDIUM, METHOD FOR INITIALIZING RECORDING MEDIUM, ENCRYPTING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RECORDING MEDIUM, DECRYPTING METHOD, AND ACOUSTIC/VIDEO/DATA DEVICE | ||
[2005/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Kagaku Media Co., Ltd. 31-19, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANAYAMA, Masaaki, Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. Yokoham Res. Ctr., 1000, Kamoshida-cho Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP | 02 /
FUJIWARA, Tsuyoshi, Mitsubishi Chemical Corp Yokoham Res. Ctr., 1000, Kamoshida-cho Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Finck, Dieter, et al V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Postfach 95 01 60 81517 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Finck, Dieter, Dr.Ing., et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Postfach 95 01 60 81517 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/19] | Ebbinghaus, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00937214.5 | 14.06.2000 | [2002/19] | WO2000JP03846 | Priority number, date | JP19990177470 | 23.06.1999 Original published format: JP 17747099 | JP19990319514 | 10.11.1999 Original published format: JP 31951499 | [2002/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0079532 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1204111 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1204111 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/00, G06F1/00 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
G11B23/284 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00115 (EP,US);
G11B20/00181 (EP,US);
G11B20/0021 (EP,US);
G11B20/00253 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/19] | G11B20/10 | Designated contracting states | DE [2004/21] |
Former [2002/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, ENTSCHLÜSSELUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2006/43] | English: | ENCRYPTION METHOD AND EQUIPMENT, DECRYPTION EQUIPMENT | [2006/43] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CRYPTAGE, DISPOSITIF DE DECRYPTAGE | [2006/43] |
Former [2002/19] | AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM, VERFAHREN ZUR INITIALISIERUNG DES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUMS,VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM, ENTSCHLÜSSELUNGSVERFRAHREN SOWIE AKUSTIK-/VIDEO-/DATENVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2002/19] | RECORDING MEDIUM, METHOD FOR INITIALIZING RECORDING MEDIUM, ENCRYPTING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RECORDING MEDIUM, DECRYPTING METHOD, AND ACOUSTIC/VIDEO/DATA DEVICE | ||
Former [2002/19] | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT, PROCEDE D'INITIALISATION DE SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT, PROCEDE DE CRYPTAGE ET DISPOSITIF POUR SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT, PROCEDE DE DECRYPTAGE ET DISPOSITIF ACOUSTIQUE/VIDEO/DONNEES | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2001 | Translation filed | 18.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 23.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1058254 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-5,7,10-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 48 * * page 9, line 14 - page 18, line 11 * * claims 1-7 *; | [X]EP0802527 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,10-13 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - column 12, line 5 *; | [X]EP0809244 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,10-13 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 25 * * column 4, line 10 - column 6, line 38 * * column 8, line 2 - line 27 * * figures 1-3,5 *; | [X]EP0561685 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,10-13 * abstract * * column 4, line 47 - column 6, line 8 * * figure 2 *; | [X]EP0773490 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,10-13 * column 8, line 6 - column 10, line 46 * * figures 9-13 *; | [PX]WO9955055 (IOMEGA CORP [US]) [PX] 1-5,7,10-13 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0023993 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR], et al) [PX] 1-5,7,10-13 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH0785574 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN); | [Y]JPH1021144 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH1196675 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH06208760 (TOSHIBA CORP) |