EP1212712 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR LISTING CLASSIFIED ADVERTISING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lapstun, Paul 13 Duke Avenue Rodd Point, New South Wales 2046 / AU | 02 /
Lapstun, Jacqueline Anne 13 Duke Avenue Rodd Point, New South Wales 2046 / AU | 03 /
Silverbrook, Kia, Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd 393 Darling Street Balmain, New South Wales 2041 / AU | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Moore, Barry Hanna, Moore & Curley, 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2002/24] | Tothill, John Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00938342.3 | 30.06.2000 | [2002/24] | WO2000AU00774 | Priority number, date | AU1999PQ01313 | 30.06.1999 Original published format: AU PQ131399 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0103020 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1212712 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1212712 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.01.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, G06Q30/00, G06F3/033 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
G06F3/03545 (EP,US);
H04N23/00 (KR);
B41J13/103 (EP,US);
B41J13/106 (EP,US);
B41J2/17503 (EP,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
B41J2/17546 (EP,US);
B41J2/17553 (EP,US);
B41J2/17556 (EP,US);
B41J2/17563 (EP,US);
B41J2/2114 (EP,US);
B42C19/02 (EP,US);
B42C9/0006 (EP,US);
B42C9/0081 (EP,US);
B65H29/34 (EP,US);
B65H37/04 (EP,US);
G06F16/3323 (EP,US);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F3/0321 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06K17/00 (EP,US);
G06Q20/042 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0248 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US);
G06Q40/06 (EP,US);
G06Q50/188 (EP,US);
G06V30/1423 (EP,US);
G09B7/00 (EP,US);
H04N1/00204 (EP,US);
H04N1/00244 (EP,US);
H04N1/00326 (EP,US);
H04N1/00334 (EP,US);
H04N1/00342 (EP,US);
H04N1/00358 (EP,US);
H04N1/00376 (EP,US);
H04N1/00567 (EP,US);
H04N1/00968 (EP,US);
H04N1/32101 (EP,US);
H04N1/32122 (EP,US);
H04N1/32128 (EP,US);
H04N1/32771 (EP,US);
H04N1/32778 (EP,US);
B42P2261/04 (EP,US);
H04N1/00127 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0082 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3243 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3247 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3249 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3269 (EP,US);
H04N2201/327 (EP,US);
Y10S707/915 (US);
Y10S707/917 (US);
Y10S707/99932 (US);
Y10S707/99933 (US);
Y10S707/99934 (US);
Y10S707/99935 (US);
|
Former IPC [2002/24] | G06F17/60, G06F17/30, G06K11/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/33] |
Former [2002/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL | Extension states | AL | 30.01.2002 | LT | 30.01.2002 | LV | 30.01.2002 | MK | 30.01.2002 | RO | 30.01.2002 | SI | 30.01.2002 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUFLISTUNG VON KLEINANZEIGEN | [2002/24] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR LISTING CLASSIFIED ADVERTISING | [2002/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME SERVANT A ETABLIR LA LISTE DE PUBLICITES CLASSEES | [2002/24] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 30.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 04.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.09.2007 | 13.09.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 09.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 09.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.06.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.2008 | BE | 10.09.2008 | CY | 10.09.2008 | DK | 10.09.2008 | FI | 10.09.2008 | IT | 10.09.2008 | NL | 10.09.2008 | PT | 10.09.2008 | SE | 10.12.2008 | GR | 11.12.2008 | ES | 21.12.2008 | [2011/46] |
Former [2011/44] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CY | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
FI | 10.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0697793 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-48 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 44 * * column 4, lines 39-43 * * column 5, lines 12-44 * * column 7, lines 2-14 * * claims 1-11 * * figure 1 *; | [X]GB2306669 (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1-48 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 3, line 22 * * page 6, line 3 - page 9, line 23 * * page 10, line 7 - page 12, line 19 * * page 16, line 7 - page 19, line 12 * * page 21, line 20 - page 22, line 19 * * page 24, line 4 - page 25, line 20 * * claims 1,8-12,14,16,17,21,28,29,31-33 *; | [A]WO9722959 (SEKENDUR ORAL [US]) [A] 1-48 * abstract * * page 1 - page 6 * * pages 8-10 * * claims 1-6,8,10,11,16-20 *; | [X]US5745882 (BIXLER MATTHEW J [US], et al) [X] 1-48 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - column 2, line 59 * * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 10 *; | [A]EP0887753 (TOHO BUSINESS MANAGEMENT CENTE [JP]) [A] 1-48 * abstract * * column 6, lines 18-24 * * column 6, lines 37-50 * * column 12, line 40 - column 13, line 33 * * column 19, lines 39-52 * * column 21, lines 45-49 * * column 23, line 2 - column 24, line 10 * * column 38, lines 4-6 * * column 40, lines 37-57 * * column 42, lines 19-23 * * column 46, lines 38-42 * * column 47, lines 43-50 * * column 65, line 32 - column 66, line 24 * * column 68, lines 5-14 * * claims 1,3,8,10-13,33,35,36,56 *; | [A]WO9919823 (INTERVAL RESEARCH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * abstract * * page 1, lines 6-11 * * page 4, lines 2-24 * * page 6, line 7 - page 7, line 3 * * page 9, lines 8-32 * * page 20, lines 1-34 ** claims 1-20 * | International search | [Y]GB2306669 (RICOH KK [JP]); | [Y]US5745882 (BIXLER MATTHEW J [US], et al) | Examination | US5661506 |