EP1171464 - PEPTIDE HOMODIMERS OR PEPTIDE HETERODIMERS DERIVED FROM INTERLEUKIN 12 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wieser, Raimund J. Korneliusstrasse 21 52076 Aachen-Kornelimünster / DE | [2002/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | Schüssler, Andrea, Dr. Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00938503.0 | 20.04.2000 | [2002/03] | WO2000DE01260 | Priority number, date | DE1999119148 | 27.04.1999 Original published format: DE 19919148 | [2002/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0064938 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1171464 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/54, A61K38/20, A61P35/00, A61P37/02 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
C07K14/5434 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/03] | Title | German: | VON INTERLEUKIN 12 ABGELEITETE PEPTID-HOMODIMERE UND PEPTID-HETERODIMERE | [2002/03] | English: | PEPTIDE HOMODIMERS OR PEPTIDE HETERODIMERS DERIVED FROM INTERLEUKIN 12 | [2002/03] | French: | HOMODIMERES POLYPEPTIDIQUES OU HETERODIMERES POLYPEPTIDIQUES DERIVES DE L'INTERLEUKINE 12 | [2002/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 01.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/22] | 06.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0640689 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1,12 * page 2, line 15 - line 20 * * page 3, line 35 - line 56 * * page 4, line 2 - line 5; example -; claim - *; | [A]US5891680 (LIESCHKE GRAHAM J [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * column 4, line 1 - line 18 * |