EP1198330 - EXTRUDER FOR PLANT FRAGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IE | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anton Heggenstaller AG Mühlenstrasse 7 D-86556 Unterbernbach / DE | [2002/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPIES, Xaver Herbststrasse 7 D-86556 Unterbernbach / DE | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Ernicke, Hans-Dieter, et al Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke Schwibbogenplatz 2b 86153 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Ernicke, Hans-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schwibbogenplatz 2b 86153 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00938693.9 | 27.05.2000 | [2002/17] | WO2000EP04852 | Priority number, date | DE1999212822U | 22.07.1999 Original published format: DE 29912822 U | [2002/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0107221 | Date: | 01.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1198330 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1198330 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B27N3/28 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
B27N3/28 (EP,US);
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
B29C48/475 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 30.11.2001 | LV | 30.11.2001 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRANGPRESSE FÜR PFLANZLICHE KLEINTEILE | [2002/17] | English: | EXTRUDER FOR PLANT FRAGMENTS | [2002/17] | French: | EXTRUDEUSE DE FRAGMENTS VEGETAUX | [2002/17] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 15.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2003 | Observations by third parties | 11.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2003 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.02.2004 | GR | 18.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | [2008/30] |
Former [2007/08] | CY | 18.02.2004 | |
IE | 18.02.2004 | ||
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | IE | 18.02.2004 | |
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | IE | 18.02.2004 | |
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | GR | 18.05.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]RU1791117 ; | [XA]DE3205866 (HEGGENSTALLER ANTON [DE]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 18; figure 2 * [A] 2-10; | [DA]DE3222113 (HEGGENSTALLER ANTON); | [DA]EP0376175 (SCHEDLBAUER KARL); | [XA]WO9504645 (ANDERSSON CURT [SE]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-10; | [DA]EP0811471 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 08, Database accession no. 1994-064195, XP002146929 & SU1791117 A 19930130 (WOOD PROCESSING IND RES INST) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | other | DE2016771 | DE2933405 | DE2932406 | WO9948659 |