EP1197081 - Authorisation system for impulse purchase for pay TV [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/16] | IMPULSE PURCHASE SYSTEM FOR PAY-TELEVISION | ||
[2002/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagravision SA 22, route de Genève 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | [2002/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUDELSKI, André Chemin de Bellingard CH-1095 Lutry / CH | 02 /
SASSELLI, Marco 20, chemin des Roches CH-1803 Chardonne / CH | 03 /
STRANSKY, Philippe Pré-Fontaine H CH-1261 Marchissy / CH | 04 /
LAFFELY, Laurent 23, chemin de Montenailles CH-1052 Le Mont-sur-Lausanne / CH | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Wenger, Joel-Théophile, et al Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Wenger, Joel-Théophile, et al Leman Consulting S.A. 62 route de Clementy 1260 Nyon / CH | Application number, filing date | 00938993.3 | 06.07.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000IB00913 | Priority number, date | CH19990001269 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: CH 126999 | [2002/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0105151 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1197081 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1197081 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
H04N7/1675 (EP,US);
H04N21/4623 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/25435 (EP,US);
H04N21/26606 (EP,US);
H04N21/47211 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/16] | Extension states | AL | 26.01.2002 | LT | 26.01.2002 | LV | 26.01.2002 | MK | 26.01.2002 | RO | 26.01.2002 | SI | 26.01.2002 | Title | German: | Zugangsberechtigungssystem für spontanen Kauf beim Bezahlfernsehen | [2002/46] | English: | Authorisation system for impulse purchase for pay TV | [2002/46] | French: | Système d'autorisation d'un achat impulsif pour télévision à péage | [2002/46] |
Former [2002/16] | FERNSEHSYSTEM MIT IMPULSIVER BEZAHLUNG PRO ANSCHAUUNG | ||
Former [2002/16] | IMPULSE PURCHASE SYSTEM FOR PAY-TELEVISION | ||
Former [2002/16] | FERNSEHSYSTEM MIT IMPULSIVER BEZAHLUNG PRO ANSCHAUUNG | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 08.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.09.2003 | FI | 03.09.2003 | DK | 03.12.2003 | GR | 03.12.2003 | [2007/08] |
Former [2004/41] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | FI | 03.09.2003 | |
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 03.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2193867 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED, et al) [A] 1-4 * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 48 * * page 8, line 21 - line 34 *; | [A]WO9843426 (CANAL PLUS SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 1 - line 15 * * page 2, line 13 - line 18 * * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 4 * * page 14, line 8 - line 23 *; | [A]EP0895415 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 5, line 29 - line 31 * * column 5, line 45 - line 55 * * column 10, line 50 - line 54 *; | [A] - "FUNCTIONAL MODEL OF A CONDITIONAL ACCESS SYSTEM", EBU REVIEW- TECHNICAL,BE,EUROPEAN BROADCASTING UNION. BRUSSELS, (19951221), no. 266, ISSN 0251-0936, pages 64 - 77, XP000559450 [A] 1-4 * page 3 * * page 5 - page 6 * * figure 6 * |