EP1120788 - CARD TYPE MAGNETIC RECORDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CITIZEN WATCH CO. LTD. 1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome, Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | For all designated states IOMEGA CORPORATION 1821 West Iomega Way Roy Utah 84067 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states Citizen Watch Co. Ltd. 1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome, Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | ||
For all designated states IOMEGA CORPORATION 1821 West Iomega Way Roy, Utah 84067 / US | |||
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0428 / JP | ||
For all designated states IOMEGA CORPORATION 1821 West Iomega Way Roy, Utah 84067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAKITA, Maki Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. Tanashiseizousho 1-12, Honcho 6-chome Tanashi-shi, Tokyo 188-0011 / JP | 02 /
MUKAIJIMA, Katsutoshi Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. Tanashiseizousho 1-12, Honcho 6-chome Tanashi-shi, Tokyo 188-0011 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Shoji Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. Tanashiseizousho 1-12, Honcho 6-chome Tanashi-shi, Tokyo 188-0011 / JP | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00939076.6 | 15.06.2000 | [2001/31] | WO2000JP03911 | Priority number, date | JP19990172838 | 18.06.1999 Original published format: JP 17283899 | JP19990172812 | 18.06.1999 Original published format: JP 17281299 | [2001/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0079535 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1120788 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B21/22, G11B5/54, G11B21/21, G11B5/60, G11B33/14 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
G11B33/121 (EP,KR);
G11B25/04 (KR);
G11B19/2009 (KR);
G11B21/12 (EP);
G11B21/21 (EP,KR);
G11B21/22 (EP);
G11B25/043 (EP);
G11B33/1493 (EP);
G11B5/54 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2001/31] | G11B21/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2001/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHES AUFZEICHNUNGSGERÄT FÜR KARTEN | [2001/31] | English: | CARD TYPE MAGNETIC RECORDING DEVICE | [2001/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT MAGNETIQUE DU TYPE CARTE | [2001/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2001 | Translation filed | 14.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2001 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 18.12.2003 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 09.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2004 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 20.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/09] | 27.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/09] | Divisional application(s) | EP04008492.3 / EP1465190 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9422135 (MINISTOR PERIPHERAL INTERNATIO [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 38, line 23 - page 39, line 28; figures 14-16 *; | [A]US5502604 (FURAY DAVID M [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 50; figure 1 * | International search | [X]US5757587 (BERG LOWELL JAMES [US], et al); | [X]US5585980 (BOUTAGHOU ZINE-EDDINE [US]); | [X]US5455723 (BOUTAGHOU ZINE-EDDINE [US], et al); | [X]US5623758 (BROOKS JR WILLIAM W [US], et al); | [Y]US5644451 (CHAN JOHN R [US], et al); | [Y]US5875074 (HO BIN-LUN [US], et al); | [A]JPH08102156 (TOSHIBA CORP) |