EP1198242 - AUTOLOGOUS THROMBIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermogenesis Corporation 3146 Gold Camp Drive Rancho Cordova, CA 95670 / US | [2002/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COELHO, Philip, H. 121 Giotto Way El Dorado Hills, CA 95762 / US | 02 /
KINGSLEY, Phil 9560 Appalachian Drive Sacramento, CA 95827 / US | 03 /
BRAUSCH, Jim 6875 Villa Juarez Circle Sacramento, CA 95828 / US | 04 /
GODSEY, James, H. 101 Summer Shade Court Folsom, CA 95630 / US | 05 /
ROCK, Gail 270 Sandridge Road Ottawa, Ontario K1L 5A2 / CA | 06 /
MADSEN, Trista, K. 8782 Los Encantos Circle Elk Grove, CA 95624 / US | 07 /
FRAUSTO, Sona, B. 7954 Graylodge Court Sacramento, CA 95828 / US | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Wood, Graham, et al Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | Wood, Graham, et al Bailey Walsh & Co L.L.P., 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | ||
Former [2002/17] | Denmark, James Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 00939285.3 | 02.06.2000 | [2002/17] | WO2000US11865 | Priority number, date | US19990328350 | 04.06.1999 Original published format: US 328350 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0074713 | Date: | 14.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1198242 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1198242 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1198242 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/48, B01L11/00, C12N9/74, C12Q1/56, G01N33/00 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
C12N9/6429 (EP,US);
A61K38/4833 (EP,US);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C12Y304/21005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOLOGES THROMBIN | [2002/17] | English: | AUTOLOGOUS THROMBIN | [2002/17] | French: | THROMBINE AUTOLOGUE | [2002/17] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 10.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.07.2008
August Winkhaus GmbH & Co. KG August-Winkhaus-Str. 31 D-48291 Telgte / DE Opponent's representative Gleiss & Grosse, et al, et al Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.07.2008
August Winkhaus GmbH & Co. KG August-Winkhaus-Str. 31 D-48291 Telgte / DE Opponent's representative Gleiss & Grosse, et al, et al Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2008 | BE | 14.05.2008 | CY | 14.05.2008 | DK | 14.05.2008 | FI | 14.05.2008 | NL | 14.05.2008 | IE | 02.06.2008 | LU | 02.06.2008 | CH | 30.06.2008 | LI | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | SE | 14.08.2008 | GR | 15.08.2008 | ES | 25.08.2008 | PT | 14.10.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CY | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 02.06.2008 | ||
LU | 02.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 02.06.2008 | ||
LU | 02.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 02.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 02.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 25.08.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO0007659 (THERMOGENESIS CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-11,13-15,17-21,23,25,26,28-34,36-38,40-44,46-49,53-66,68 * the whole document *; | [A] - STRYKER M H ET AL, "Blood fractionation: proteins.", ADVANCES IN BIOTECHNOLOGICAL PROCESSES. 1985, (1985), vol. 4, ISSN 0736-2293, pages 275 - 336, XP009038557 [A] 1-68 * page 284 - page 291 * | International search | [A]US5510102 (COCHRUM KENT C [US]); | [X]WO9631245 (HAMILTON CIVIC HOSPITALS RES [CA], et al); | [X]US5643192 (HIRSH JACK [CA], et al); | [X]US5795780 (CEDERHOLM-WILLIAMS STEWART A [GB], et al); | [AP]WO9945938 (BIOSURGICAL CORP [US], et al); | [AP]US6063297 (ANTANAVICH RICHARD D [US], et al) |