EP1196071 - VERTICAL HEARTH BARBECUE GRILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andress, Alphonso G. Malecon Balta 720 Lima / PE | For all designated states Harbin, Lawrence 2906 Maplewood Drive Alexandria, VA 22302 / US | [2002/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Manke, Lars Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Manke, Lars (DE) Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00939851.2 | 14.06.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000US16256 | Priority number, date | US19990332903 | 15.06.1999 Original published format: US 332903 | US19990434379 | 05.11.1999 Original published format: US 434379 | US20000515035 | 06.03.2000 Original published format: US 515035 | US20000544336 | 06.04.2000 Original published format: US 544336 | US20000575241 | 22.05.2000 Original published format: US 575241 | [2003/02] |
Former [2002/16] | US19990322903 | 15.06.1999 | |
US19990434379 | 05.11.1999 | ||
US20000515035 | 06.03.2000 | ||
US20000544336 | 06.04.2000 | ||
US20000575241 | 22.05.2000 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0076381 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1196071 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/00, A47J37/07 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
A47J37/0718 (EP);
A47J37/0731 (EP);
A47J37/0727 (EP);
A47J37/0763 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/16] | A47J37/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRILL-EINHEIT MIT VERTIKALER FEUERSTELLE | [2002/16] | English: | VERTICAL HEARTH BARBECUE GRILL | [2002/16] | French: | GRILL DE BARBECUE A FOYER VERTICAL | [2002/16] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 19.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/27] | 07.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5947007 ; | [X]US5431093 ; | [X]US5937768 ; | [X]US4672944 ; | [X]US3809051 ; | [X]US2813478 ; | [Y]US5823174 ; | [Y]US2885950 ; | [Y]US5259299 ; | [Y]US5241948 ; | [Y]US4730597 ; | [Y]US5261388 ; | [Y]US3200806 ; | [Y]US3230948 ; | [Y]US4553523 ; | [Y]US5105726 ; | [Y]US5782168 ; | [Y]US3175549 ; | [Y]US4646711 ; | [Y]US2940381 ; | [Y]US4608917 ; | [Y]US5839361 ; | [Y]US5396878 ; | [Y]US2515521 ; | [Y]US5678531 |