EP1200914 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR EXAMINATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Silverbrook, Kia Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd, 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | 02 /
LAPSTUN, Jacqueline, Anne 13 Duke Avenue Rodd Point, NSW 2046 / AU | 03 /
LAPSTUN, Paul 13 Duke Avenue Rodd Point, NSW 2046 / AU | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Moore, Barry Hanna, Moore & Curley, 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2002/18] | Tothill, John Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00940036.7 | 30.06.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000AU00761 | Priority number, date | AU1999PQ01313 | 30.06.1999 Original published format: AU PQ131399 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0103013 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1200914 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.01.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, G06K19/00 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
G06F3/03545 (EP,US);
H04N23/00 (KR);
B41J13/103 (EP,US);
B41J13/106 (EP,US);
B41J2/17503 (EP,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
B41J2/17546 (EP,US);
B41J2/17553 (EP,US);
B41J2/17556 (EP,US);
B41J2/17563 (EP,US);
B41J2/2114 (EP,US);
B42C19/02 (EP,US);
B42C9/0006 (EP,US);
B42C9/0081 (EP,US);
B65H29/34 (EP,US);
B65H37/04 (EP,US);
G06F16/3323 (EP,US);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F3/0321 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06K17/00 (EP,US);
G06Q20/042 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0248 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US);
G06Q40/06 (EP,US);
G06Q50/188 (EP,US);
G06V30/1423 (EP,US);
G09B7/00 (EP,US);
H04N1/00204 (EP,US);
H04N1/00244 (EP,US);
H04N1/00326 (EP,US);
H04N1/00334 (EP,US);
H04N1/00342 (EP,US);
H04N1/00358 (EP,US);
H04N1/00376 (EP,US);
H04N1/00567 (EP,US);
H04N1/00968 (EP,US);
H04N1/32101 (EP,US);
H04N1/32122 (EP,US);
H04N1/32128 (EP,US);
H04N1/32771 (EP,US);
H04N1/32778 (EP,US);
B42P2261/04 (EP,US);
H04N1/00127 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0082 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3243 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3247 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3249 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3269 (EP,US);
H04N2201/327 (EP,US);
Y10S707/915 (US);
Y10S707/917 (US);
Y10S707/99932 (US);
Y10S707/99933 (US);
Y10S707/99934 (US);
Y10S707/99935 (US);
|
Former IPC [2002/18] | G06F17/60, G06K9/18, G06K19/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL [2002/18] | Extension states | AL | 30.01.2002 | LT | 30.01.2002 | LV | 30.01.2002 | MK | 30.01.2002 | RO | 30.01.2002 | SI | 30.01.2002 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FUR PRUFUNGEN. | [2002/18] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR EXAMINATIONS | [2002/18] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'EXAMENS | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 30.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 01.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.04.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/36] | 26.04.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5198642 (DENIGER DAVID B [US]) [A] 1-54 * column 4, line 2 - column 6, line 29 ** column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 44 *; | [A]US5640193 (WELLNER PIERRE DAVID [US]) [A] 1-54 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 20 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 6 * * column 5, line 18 - line 26 * * column 6, line 17 - line 51; figures 2,3 *; | [X]WO9722959 (SEKENDUR ORAL [US]) [X] 1-54 * page 8, paragraph 1 - page 10, paragraph 2; figure 6 *; | [X]US5661506 (LAZZOUNI MOHAMED [US], et al) [X] 1-54 * abstract * * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 24 * * column 7, line 22 - line 31; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9919823 (INTERVAL RESEARCH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-54 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 19 * * page 6, line 7 - page 7, line 3 * * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 25 * * page 13, line 25 - page 14, line 35 * * page 20, line 1 - line 10; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH0968919 ; | [Y]JPH07295958 ; | [Y]US5198642 (DENIGER DAVID B [US]); | [Y]GB2306669 (RICOH KK [JP]) | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1997-223190/20, & JPH0968919 A 19970311 (SHARP KK) | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1996-024735/03, & JPH07295958 A 19951110 (RICOH KK) |