EP1208709 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE AUTOMATED ANALYSIS OF A MOBILE RADIO TELEPHONE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/22] | METHOD FOR THE AUTOMATED ANALYSIS OF A MOBILE RADIO TELEPHONE SYSTEM | ||
[2003/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ascom AG Belpstrasse 37, Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Ascom AG Belpstrasse 37, Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOBST, Hanspeter Allmendstrasse 32 CH-4702 Oensingen / CH | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Roshardt, Werner Alfred Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Roshardt, Werner Alfred, Dipl.-Phys. Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Schmiedenplatz 5 Postfach 3000 Bern 7 / CH | Application number, filing date | 00940102.7 | 11.07.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000CH00376 | Priority number, date | EP19990810766 | 26.08.1999 Original published format: EP 99810766 | [2002/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0117299 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1208709 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1208709 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/34 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
H04W24/08 (EP,US);
H04W24/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/33] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG FÜR EINE MASCHINENGESTÜTZTE ANALYSE EINES MOBILFUNKSYSTEMS | [2003/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE AUTOMATED ANALYSIS OF A MOBILE RADIO TELEPHONE SYSTEM | [2003/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ANALYSE AUTOMATISEE D'UN SYSTEME DE RADIOTELEPHONIE MOBILE | [2003/01] |
Former [2002/22] | VERFAHREN FÜR EINE MASCHINENGESTÜTZTE ANALYSE EINES MOBILFUNKSYSTEMS | ||
Former [2002/22] | METHOD FOR THE AUTOMATED ANALYSIS OF A MOBILE RADIO TELEPHONE SYSTEM | ||
Former [2002/22] | PROCEDE D'ANALYSE AUTOMATISEE D'UN SYSTEME DE RADIOTELEPHONIE MOBILE | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 03.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.08.2003 | IE | 13.08.2003 | IT | 13.08.2003 | NL | 13.08.2003 | DK | 13.11.2003 | GR | 13.11.2003 | ES | 24.11.2003 | PT | 13.01.2004 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/08] | CY | 13.08.2003 | |
IE | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | IE | 13.08.2003 | |
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | IE | 13.08.2003 | |
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | IE | 13.08.2003 | |
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | NL | 13.08.2003 | |
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 13.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9315569 (COMARCO INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,8,11,12 * figures 7,8; claims 1,2,6 * * page 44, line 7 - page 45, line 4 *; | [DA]WO9315591 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI]) [DA] 1,10* abstract *; | [A]US5481588 (RICKLI HANSUELI [CH], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]US5490204 (GULLEDGE KENNETH G [US]) [Y] 1,2,8,11,12 * figures 1,23-29B * * column 2, line 45 - line 57 * * column 3, line 8 - line 36 * * column 14, line 39 - column 15, line 28 * |