EP1112325 - AQUEOUS SOLID GEL COMPRISING A HYDROPHILIC GELLING AGENT AND A PARTICULAR POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL, COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAME AND USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARA, Isabelle 57, rue de Tolbiac F-75013 Paris / FR | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Boulard, Denis L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Boulard, Denis L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | ||
Former [2005/30] | Boulard, Denis L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | ||
Former [2001/27] | Doressamy, Clarisse L'Oreal, D.P.I., 6, rue Bertrand Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00940464.1 | 08.06.2000 | [2001/27] | WO2000FR01577 | Priority number, date | FR19990007766 | 18.06.1999 Original published format: FR 9907766 | [2001/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0078868 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1112325 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1112325 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/02, C08L5/00, A61K7/02, A61K7/027, C08L101/00 | [2001/27] | CPC: |
A61K8/042 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP);
A61K8/20 (EP);
A61K8/29 (EP);
A61K8/73 (EP);
A61K8/86 (EP);
A61K8/9717 (EP,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP);
A61Q5/10 (EP);
C08J3/075 (EP);
C08L3/02 (EP);
C08L3/04 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L3/02, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L3/04, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L5/00, C08L2666/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/19] |
Former [2001/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGES, FESTES GEL ENTHALTEND EIN HYDROPHILES GELIERUNGSMITTEL UND EIN BESONDERES POLYETHYLENEGLYKOL, ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND DIESES GEL UND VERWENDUNGEN | [2001/27] | English: | AQUEOUS SOLID GEL COMPRISING A HYDROPHILIC GELLING AGENT AND A PARTICULAR POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL, COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAME AND USES | [2001/27] | French: | GEL AQUEUX SOLIDE COMPRENANT UN GELIFIANT HYDROPHILE ET UN POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL PARTICULIER, COMPOSITION COMPRENANT CE GEL ET UTILISATIONS | [2001/27] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 20.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.02.2004
17.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE HENKEL KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 D-40191 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE | [2005/44] |
Former [2004/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.02.2004
HENKEL KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 D-40191 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE Opponent's representative Jönsson, Hans-Peter, Dr.Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | 12.03.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.02.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.02.2006 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 05.11.2008 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2009/13] | Appeal following opposition | 05.04.2006 | Appeal received No. T0494/06 | 20.06.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.11.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 05.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.11.2008 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 08.06.2004 | ES | 09.06.2004 | DE | 01.01.2005 | FR | 28.02.2005 | IT | 08.06.2005 | [2007/34] |
Former [2007/08] | GB | 08.06.2004 | |
ES | 09.06.2004 | ||
DE | 01.01.2005 | ||
FR | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | GB | 08.06.2004 | |
DE | 01.01.2005 | ||
FR | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | DE | 01.01.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0803245 (INTERCOS ITALIANA [IT]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A] - "GELATIN-FREE SYSTEM FOR SOFT/HARD CAPSULES CONTAINING GELLAN GUM", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE,GB,INDUSTRIAL OPPORTUNITIES LTD. HAVANT, (19911201), no. 332, ISSN 0374-4353, page 908, XP000274618 [A] 1 * abstract * |