EP1211926 - METHOD FOR BREEDING TOMATOES HAVING REDUCED WATER CONTENT AND PRODUCT OF THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STATE OF ISRAEL-MINISTRY OF AGRICULTURE Volcani Research Center P.O. Box 6 IL-50 250 Beit Dagan / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states STATE OF ISRAEL-MINISTRY OF AGRICULTURE Volcani Research Center P.O. Box 6 IL-50 250 Beit Dagan / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAFFER, Arthur 16 Hazait Street 73127 Hashmonaim / IL | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/04] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/24] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00940724.8 | 04.07.2000 | [2002/24] | WO2000IL00389 | Priority number, date | IL19990131509 | 19.08.1999 Original published format: IL 13150999 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0113708 | Date: | 01.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1211926 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1211926 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01H5/10, A01H1/04 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
A01H1/04 (EP,US);
A01H6/825 (EP,US);
A01H1/02 (EP,US);
A01H5/08 (EP,US);
A23L19/09 (EP,US);
A23L27/63 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZUCHT VON TOMATEN MIT NIEDRIGEM WASSERGEHALT UND PRODUKT DIESES VERFAHRENS | [2002/24] | English: | METHOD FOR BREEDING TOMATOES HAVING REDUCED WATER CONTENT AND PRODUCT OF THE METHOD | [2002/24] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE CULTIVER DES TOMATES AYANT UNE TENEUR EN EAU REDUITE ET PRODUIT OBTENU AU MOYEN DE CE PROCEDE | [2002/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 03.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 01.11.2011 | Observations by third parties | 04.11.2011 | Observations by third parties | 21.11.2011 | Observations by third parties | 08.12.2011 | Observations by third parties | 14.02.2012 | Observations by third parties | 07.03.2012 | Observations by third parties | 08.09.2017 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2004
30.08.2004
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC Weena 455/Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment 3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4Y 0DY / NL Opponent's representative Tjon, Hon Kong Guno Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2004
30.08.2004
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC Weena 455/Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment 3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4Y 0DY / NL Opponent's representative Tjon, Hon Kong Guno Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2004/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2004
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Tjon Tien Ril, Hon Kong Guno Unilever N.V., Patent Department P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | 01.10.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.04.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.04.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.05.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 08.02.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.03.2018 | 08.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 28.04.2018 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/36] | Appeal following opposition | 08.08.2006 | Appeal received No. T1242/06 | 29.09.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.12.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 07.08.2006 | Appeal received No. T1242/06 | 29.09.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.12.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 08.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.11.2011 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | 19.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.09.2007 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | 08.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.12.2015 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 26.09.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.10.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.11.2003 | CY | 26.11.2003 | FI | 26.11.2003 | DK | 26.02.2004 | SE | 26.02.2004 | PT | 26.04.2004 | LU | 04.07.2004 | IE | 05.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | GB | 04.07.2016 | IT | 04.07.2016 | ES | 05.07.2016 | BE | 31.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | FR | 01.08.2016 | NL | 01.08.2016 | DE | 01.02.2017 | GR | 07.02.2017 | [2018/28] |
Former [2017/45] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CY | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
PT | 26.04.2004 | ||
LU | 04.07.2004 | ||
IE | 05.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
GB | 04.07.2016 | ||
IT | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
NL | 01.08.2016 | ||
DE | 01.02.2017 | ||
GR | 07.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CY | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
PT | 26.04.2004 | ||
LU | 04.07.2004 | ||
IE | 05.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
GB | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
FR | 01.08.2016 | ||
NL | 01.08.2016 | ||
DE | 01.02.2017 | ||
GR | 07.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CY | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
PT | 26.04.2004 | ||
LU | 04.07.2004 | ||
IE | 05.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2008/03] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CY | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
PT | 26.04.2004 | ||
LU | 04.07.2004 | ||
IE | 05.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CY | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
LU | 04.07.2004 | ||
IE | 05.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
LU | 04.07.2004 | ||
IE | 05.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
LU | 04.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 26.11.2003 | |
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 26.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A] - GOLIAS, J., "Resistance of tomato cultivars to fruit cracking", CAB, CAB INTERNATIONAL, WALLINGFORD, OXON, GB, (1984), XP002149829 [A] 1,15,16 * abstract * | [AD] - BERNACCHI D ET AL, "Advanced backcross QTL analysis in tomato. I. Identification of QTLS for traits of agronomic importance from Lycopersicon hirsutum.", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (199808), Database accession no. PREV199800480218, XP002149830 [AD] 1,15,16 * abstract * | [ ] - THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, (199808), vol. 97, no. 3, ISSN 0040-5752, pages 381 - 397 | other | - Deutscher Bundestag, Antrag der Fraktionen CDU/CSU, SPD, FDP und BÜNDNIS 90/DIE GRÜNEN. Drucksache 17/8344, XP003030402 |