EP1193477 - FLOW RATE SENSOR UNIT, FLOWMETER AND FLOW SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO., LTD. 11-1 Osaki 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8584 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd. 11-1 Osaki 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8584 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGISHI, Kiyoshi, Mitsui Min. & Smelt. Co., Ltd. Corporate R & D Center, 1333-2, Haraichi Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 02 /
TOMONARI, Kenji, Mitsui Mining & Smelt. Co., Ltd. Corporate R & D Center, 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 03 /
INOUE, Shinichi, Mitsui Mining & Smelt. Co., Ltd. Corporate R & D Center, 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHATA, Takayuki, Mitsui Min. & Smelt. Co., Ltd. Corporate R & D Center, 1333-2, Haraichi Ageo-shi-Saitama 362-0021 / JP | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2002/14] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr., et al Studio Brevetti e Marchi NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.r.l., Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00940780.0 | 21.06.2000 | [2002/14] | WO2000JP04057 | Priority number, date | JP19990178787 | 24.06.1999 Original published format: JP 17878799 | JP19990267504 | 21.09.1999 Original published format: JP 26750499 | JP19990267505 | 21.09.1999 Original published format: JP 26750599 | [2002/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0079221 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1193477 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/68 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
G01F1/6965 (EP,US);
G01F1/68 (KR);
G01F1/684 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/14] | Title | German: | DURCHFLUSS- SENSOREINHEIT, DURCHFLUSSMESSER UND STRöMUNGSAUFNEHMER | [2002/14] | English: | FLOW RATE SENSOR UNIT, FLOWMETER AND FLOW SENSOR | [2002/14] | French: | DETECTEUR DE DEBIT, DEBITMETRE ET CAPTEUR DE FLUX | [2002/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2001 | Translation filed | 15.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 06.11.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5780737 (WIBLE ERIC J [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 6 - column 7, line 9; figures 1-6 * [A] 10,21; | [A]GB1219710 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD [GB]) [A] 1,10,21 * page 2, line 55 - line 76; figure 1 *; | [X]WO9919694 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP], et al) [X] 21 * abstract *; | [E]EP1024350 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]) [E] 21 | International search | [X]WO9927327 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH09273951 (HITACHI LTD, et al) |