EP1119648 - COLD WORKABLE STEEL BAR OR WIRE AND PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, Ohtemachi-2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Ohtemachi-2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OCHI, Tatsuro Nippon Steel Corp. Muroran Works, 12, Nakamachi Muroran City, Hokkaido 050-0087 / JP | 02 /
KANISAWA, Hideo Nippon Steel Corp. Muroran Works, 12, Nakamachi Muroran City, Hokkaido 050-0087 / JP | 03 /
KUBOTA, Manabu Nippon Steel Corp. Muroran Works, 12, Nakamachi Muroran City, Hokkaido 050-0087 / JP | 04 /
ADACHI, Koji Nippon Steel Corp. Muroran Works, 12, Nakamachi Muroran City, Hokkaido 050-0087 / JP | 05 /
SEKI, Ryuichi Nippon Steel Corp. Muroran Works, 12, Nakamachi Muroran City, Hokkaido 050-0087 / JP | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/31] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00940894.9 | 29.06.2000 | [2001/31] | WO2000JP04321 | Priority number, date | JP19990186376 | 30.06.1999 Original published format: JP 18637699 | [2001/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0102615 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1119648 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1119648 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/14, C21D8/06 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
C22C38/32 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR,US);
C21D1/32 (EP,US);
C21D8/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/14 (EP,US);
C22C38/18 (EP,US);
C22C38/28 (EP,US);
C21D2211/003 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2001/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KALT BEARBEITBARER STAHLDRAHT ODER STAHLSTAB UND VERFAHREN | [2001/31] | English: | COLD WORKABLE STEEL BAR OR WIRE AND PROCESS | [2001/31] | French: | BARRE OU FIL D'ACIER MANIABLE A FROID ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2001/31] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 02.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH07188858 ; | [A]EP0899351 (SNAP ON TECH INC [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [DA]US4702778 (TAKAHASHI TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPH08302445 ; | [A]JPH0790484 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07188858 A 19950725 (MITSUBISHI STEEL MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08302445 A 19961119 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, & JP07090484 A 19950404 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |