EP1202857 - POLYMERIC MEMBRANES FUNCTIONALIZED WITH POLYHYDROXYPYRIDINONE LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IBC ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 856 East Utah Valley Drive P.O. Box 98 American Fork, UT 84003 / US | For all designated states Mykrolis Corporation One Patriots Park Bedford, MA 01730-2271 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states IBC ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 856 East Utah Valley Drive P.O. Box 98 American Fork, UT 84003 / US | ||
For all designated states Mykrolis Corporation One Patriots Park Bedford, MA 01730-2271 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUENING, Ronald, L. 1059 North 300 West American Fork, UT 84003 / US | 02 /
KRAKOWIAK, Krzysztof, E. 1358 North 1850 West Provo, UT 84604 / US | 03 /
DILEO, Anthony, J. 13 Vose Road Westford, MA 01886 / US | 04 /
PAREKH, Bipin, S. 2 Kastraki Place Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 00941367.5 | 09.06.2000 | [2002/19] | WO2000US16110 | Priority number, date | US19990330543 | 11.06.1999 Original published format: US 330543 | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0076760 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1202857 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/26, B01D11/00, B01D63/00 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
B01D67/00931 (EP,US);
B01J45/00 (EP,US);
B01D2323/30 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249954 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31544 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/19] | Title | German: | MIT POLYHYDROXYPYRIDINONE-LIGANDEN FUNKTIONALISIERTE POLYMERMEMBRANEN | [2002/19] | English: | POLYMERIC MEMBRANES FUNCTIONALIZED WITH POLYHYDROXYPYRIDINONE LIGANDS | [2002/19] | French: | MEMBRANES POLYMERES FONCTIONNALISEES AVEC DES LIGANDS DE POLYHYDROXYPYRIDINONE | [2002/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 31.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/28] | 09.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5618433 (TARBET BRYON J [US], et al); | [DXY]US5624901 (RAYMOND KENNETH N [US], et al); | [Y]WO9749492 (IBC ADVANCED TECH INC [US], et al) | International search | [A]US4618533 (STEUCK MICHAEL J [US]); | [A]US5547760 (TARBET BRYON J [US], et al); | [A]US5618433 (TARBET BRYON J [US], et al) |