EP1196876 - WAGERING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASIP Holdings, Inc. 14875 Bayview Avenue Aurora, Ontario L4G 3G8 / CA | [2005/16] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states Stronach, Andrew M. 14875 Bayview Avenue Aurora, Ontario L3G 4G8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stronach, Andrew M. 14875 Bayview Ave. Aurora, Ontario L4G 3G8 / CA | [2005/16] |
Former [2002/16] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00941819.5 | 19.06.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000CA00729 | Priority number, date | US19990140115P | 18.06.1999 Original published format: US 140115 P | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0079442 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1196876 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, G07F17/32 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
G07F17/32 (EP);
G06Q50/34 (EP);
G07F17/3288 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WETTSYSTEM | [2002/16] | English: | WAGERING SYSTEM | [2002/16] | French: | SYSTEME DE PARI | [2002/16] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 13.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/25] | 06.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/25] | 16.05.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.06.2007 | 16.05.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.08.2003 | 30.06.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5830068 (BRENNER MARK A [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - column 5, line 3 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 2-6,8-13; | [XA]US5743525 (HADDAD GEORGE N [US]) [X] 7,8 * the whole document * [A] 1-6,9-13; | [PX]WO0025876 (RACETECH L L C [US]) [PX] 1,7 * abstract * | by applicant | US5374060 | US5743525 | US5257400 |