EP1189933 - ECHINOCANDIN DERIVATIVES, METHOD FOR PREPARING THE SAME AND APPLICATION AS ANTIFUNGAL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/13] | ECHINOCANDIN DERIVATIVES, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME AND APPLICATION AS ANTIFUNGAL AGENTS | ||
[2002/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | [2002/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAUVEAU, Patrick 40, avenue Camille Desmoulins F-93190 Livry Gargan / FR | 02 /
HAWSER, Stephen Via Casa Zamboni, 54 I-37020 Arbizzano di Valpolicella / IT | 03 /
LEBOURG, Gilles 43, rue de Maison Rouge F-93220 Gagny / FR | 04 /
SCHIO, Laurent 24, allée Charles Magne F-93140 Bondy / FR | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Rousseau, Pierick Edouard, et al Aventis Pharma S.A. Direction des Brevets Tri LEO/144 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Rousseau, Pierrick Edouard, et al Aventis Pharma S.A. Département des Brevets, 102, Route de Noisy 93235 Romainville Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00942169.4 | 08.06.2000 | [2002/13] | WO2000FR01568 | Priority number, date | FR19990007251 | 09.06.1999 Original published format: FR 9907251 | [2002/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0075177 | Date: | 14.12.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1189933 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1189933 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/56, A61K38/12, A61P31/10 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
C07K7/56 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
Y10S930/27 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ECHINOCANDINDERIVATE, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS FUNGIZID | [2002/22] | English: | ECHINOCANDIN DERIVATIVES, METHOD FOR PREPARING THE SAME AND APPLICATION AS ANTIFUNGAL AGENTS | [2002/22] | French: | DERIVES DE L'ECHINOCANDINE, LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET LEUR APPLICATION COMME ANTIFONGIQUES | [2002/13] |
Former [2002/13] | ECHINOCANDINDERIVATE, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG ALS FUNGIZID | ||
Former [2002/13] | ECHINOCANDIN DERIVATIVES, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME AND APPLICATION AS ANTIFUNGAL AGENTS | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9613272 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [PX]WO9929716 (HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL INC [FR], et al) [PX] 1-18 * the whole document * |