EP1198301 - IMPEDANCE MATCHING TRANSDUCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Financial Services Centre P.O. Box 111 Bishops Court Hill St. Michael / BB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Financial Services Centre, P.O. Box 111, Bishops Court Hill St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAMAYEK, Don, S. 3395 Truman Avenue Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss, 5 Crown Street St. Ives, Cambridge PE27 5EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 00942330.2 | 19.07.2000 | [2002/17] | WO2000IB00994 | Priority number, date | US19990358496 | 21.07.1999 Original published format: US 358496 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0105522 | Date: | 25.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1198301 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1198301 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/06, G10K11/02 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
B06B1/0622 (EP,US);
G10K11/02 (EP,US);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/17] | Title | German: | WANDLER MIT IMPEDANZANPASSUNG | [2002/17] | English: | IMPEDANCE MATCHING TRANSDUCERS | [2002/17] | French: | TRANSDUCTEURS D'ADAPTATION D'IMPEDANCE | [2002/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 18.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.09.2005 | BE | 14.09.2005 | CH | 14.09.2005 | CY | 14.09.2005 | FI | 14.09.2005 | LI | 14.09.2005 | DK | 14.12.2005 | GR | 14.12.2005 | SE | 14.12.2005 | ES | 25.12.2005 | PT | 14.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2006/50] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 14.09.2005 | |
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 14.09.2005 | |
SE | 14.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0355694 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,12,17,19,28,29* column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 45 *; | [XA]US5045746 (WERSING WOLFRAM [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,9-13,15,17-19,21-23,25-27 * column 4, line 3 - line 25; figure 1 * [A] 28,29; | [XA]US5164920 (BAST ULRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,9-13,17,18 * column 5, line 4 - column 6, line 64; figures 2,4 * [A] 19,28,29; | [X]EP0629993 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4-10,12-26,28,29 * column 16, line 24 - line 58; figure 8 * |