EP1219377 - MANUFACTURING DEVICE FOR HEATING TUBE WITH INTERNAL GROOVES AND FIN ROLLING ROLL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Shindoh Corporation 6-2, Ginza 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8222 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Shindoh Corporation 6-2, Ginza 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8222 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUUCHI, Tetsuya Mitsubishi Shindoh Co., Ltd. Wakamatsu Seisakusho 128-7, Ogi-machi Aizuwakamatsu-shi Fukushima 965-8522 / JP | 02 /
FUKATAMI, Takao Mitsubishi Shindoh Co., Ltd. Wakamatsu Seisakusho 128-7, Ogi-machi Aizuwakamatsu-shi Fukushima 965-8522 / JP | 03 /
KIKUCHI, Shin Mitsubishi Shindoh Co., Ltd. Wakamatsu Seisakusho 128-7, Ogi-machi Aizuwakamatsu-shi Fukushima 965-8522 / JP | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 00942365.8 | 28.06.2000 | [2002/27] | WO2000JP04246 | Priority number, date | JP19990188264 | 01.07.1999 Original published format: JP 18826499 | [2002/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0102124 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1219377 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/00, B21D53/06 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
B21B1/227 (EP);
B21B27/005 (EP);
B21C37/083 (EP);
B21C37/20 (EP);
B21H3/00 (KR);
B21B17/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUM ERWÄRMEN VON ROHREN MIT INNEREN NUTEN UND ROHRWALZE | [2002/27] | English: | MANUFACTURING DEVICE FOR HEATING TUBE WITH INTERNAL GROOVES AND FIN ROLLING ROLL | [2002/27] | French: | APPAREIL DE FABRICATION DE TUBES DE CHAUFFAGE A RAINURES INTERIEURES ET CYLINDRE DE LAMINAGE D'AILETTES | [2002/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2002 | Translation filed | 30.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 31.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/29] | 13.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH03169441 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]US5365763 (CRETIN MICHEL [FR], et al) |