EP1198533 - PRESSURE SENSITIVE ADHESIVE SHEET AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMANAKA, Keizo Nihonmatsu 4-28-2-102 Sagamihara-city, Kanagawa 229-1137 / JP | 02 /
FUKUSHI, Tatsuo 2-9-45, Higashifuchinobe Sagamihara-city, Kanagawa 229 / JP | 03 /
TAKAMATSU, Yorinobu 11-7, Kamimizo 3-chome Sagamihara-city, Kanagawa 229-1123 / JP | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2002/17] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 00943144.6 | 23.06.2000 | [2002/17] | WO2000US17457 | Priority number, date | JP19990189081 | 02.07.1999 Original published format: JP 18908199 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0102508 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1198533 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1198533 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
C09J7/245 (EP);
C09J201/00 (KR);
C09J7/22 (EP);
C09J7/38 (EP);
C09J2301/416 (EP);
C09J2427/006 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | DRUCKEMPFINDLICHES KLEBEBAND UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN | [2002/17] | English: | PRESSURE SENSITIVE ADHESIVE SHEET AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | [2002/17] | French: | FEUILLE AUTOCOLLANTE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2002/17] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 23.06.2011 | FR | 30.06.2011 | [2012/30] |
Former [2012/23] | FR | 30.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS4929613B ; | [A]JPH0873819 ; | [A]GB868463 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [A] 1-18 * page 1, line 32 - line 52 *; | [DA]US3252880 (MICHEL MAGAT, et al) [DA] 1-18* example 8 *; | [DA]US4861408 (KELBER JEFFRY A [US]) [DA] 1-18 * claims 1-3,16 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1974, no. 35, Database accession no. 1974-62357V, XP002149248 & JPS4929613B B1 19740806 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1,8,17 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, & JP08073819 A 19960319 (TORAY IND INC) [A] 1-18 * abstract * |