EP1268332 - Device for intermediately storing flat objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/01] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANAGING A DEVICE FOR INTERMEDIATELY STORING FLAT OBJECTS | ||
[2006/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferag AG Zürichstrasse 74 8340 Hinwil / CH | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAUBER, Hans, Ulrich Neugutstrasse 15 CH-8624 Grüt / CH | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Frei, Alexandra Sarah, et al Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Frei, Alexandra Sarah, et al Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 768 8029 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 00943510.8 | 20.07.2000 | [2003/01] | WO2000CH00398 | Priority number, date | CH19990001396 | 28.07.1999 Original published format: CH 139699 | [2003/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0109024 | Date: | 08.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1268332 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1268332 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65H29/00 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
B65H19/12 (EP);
B65H29/006 (EP);
B65H2301/41702 (EP);
B65H2301/4172 (EP);
B65H2405/422 (EP);
B65H2701/1932 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/35] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einrichtung für die Zwischenlagerung von flachen Gegenständen | [2006/13] | English: | Device for intermediately storing flat objects | [2006/13] | French: | Dispositif de stockage temporaire d'article plats | [2006/13] |
Former [2003/01] | VERFHAREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEWIRTSCHAFTUNG EINER EINRICHTUNG ZUR ZWISCHENLAGERUNG VON FLACHEN GEGENSTÄNDEN | ||
Former [2003/01] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANAGING A DEVICE FOR INTERMEDIATELY STORING FLAT OBJECTS | ||
Former [2003/01] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR EXPLOITER UN DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE TEMPORAIRE D'ARTICLES PLATS | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2002 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 14.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.08.2006 | FI | 30.08.2006 | FR | 30.08.2006 | IE | 30.08.2006 | NL | 30.08.2006 | PT | 30.08.2006 | GR | 01.12.2006 | ES | 11.12.2006 | [2011/46] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
FR | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/52] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
FR | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/23] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 30.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3115479 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]); | [A]GB2170793 (GRAPHA HOLDING AG) [A] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2181117 (WIFAG MASCHF) [A] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0333648 (SFT AG SPONTANFOERDERTECHNIK [CH]); | [Y]US5067871 (HILBER WALTER [DE]) [Y] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US5085377 (ROHRER JEAN [CH], et al); | [Y]EP0701957 (GRAPHA HOLDING AG [CH]) [Y] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0719720 (FERAG AG [CH]) [A] 1,13 * abstract *; | [A]DE19637771 (KOENIG & BAUER ALBERT AG [DE]) [A] 1,13 * the whole document * | Examination | US5398883 | EP0950626 |